Lyons et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cole, Mary Wilson McCullen, Matthew Jones, Margaret Spencer, Prentice Williams, Margaret Turner-Davis, Shardra Smith, John Black, Carolyn Howard, James William Moon, Jr., James M. Criswell, Charisa Maynard, Keri Hicks, Kent Monroe, Eunice Murphy, Cynthia Gordon, Levoice Weary, Jr., Derrick Jones, James McKnight, Leander Patrick, Arden Frost, Constance R. Walker, De'Mon Nolan, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Shelia Ford, Delores Dodd, Lashawn Victor, Jacqueline Garrett, Louverne Boddie, Myron Rogers, Marcus Cole, Daniel Davis, E. Sanchel Spears, Henry Percival Williams, Kenneth L. Casey, Durrell Richard, Mark Hicks, Nigel Luster, Robert Welles, Timothy Whaley, Sam E. Thompson, Phillip Haggan, Ronald Eric King, Trina Sutton, Maurice Lee, Benjamin Henry Waters, Keri Brady, Valorie Denton, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Cora Spears, Lois A. Goetz, Derrick Carr, Corey Malone, Evelyn Little, George Beverly, Jr., Roy L. Robinson, Cindy Cowden, Sarah Dugas, Ronnette Archelle, Renetta C. Tornes, Oris Anderson, Daron J. Davis, Jerome Armstead, William Parker, Earl Goforth, Mia J. Abbott, Charles Woody, Christopher Michael Abraham, Lawrence Owens, Dale Cornelius Sharp, David Keach, Gerald Starks, Angela M. Carmouche, Shirley Brents, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Ethline Thomas, Prentice Page, Walter M. Henry, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Brian Hayes, Bernell Endsley, Timothy Allen Hickle, Wilfredo Morales, Gregory A. Craig, Patricia A. Williams, Devonia Young, Stephen J. Spradlin, Patricia Malone, Demica Copelin, Joseph A. Gallow, Milton L. Mosley, Lloyd H. Peoples, Patrick Dennis, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Patrick Heinze, Emile Gainey, Charles Purdie, Pedro A. Benitez, Debra Gonzalez, Hosea Allen, Tiarrence Grayson, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Jamal Metoyer, Jeffrey May, Darlene Robertson, Lance Bartholomew, Eric Johnson, Darrel G. Christ, Tommy Kinner, Joy Taylor, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Alex Wells, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Lisa Renee Devereux, Kabrodrick Brantley, Erma Marzett, Robert Patmon, Terry W. Garrett, Stephen Riggs, Jacqueline E. Williams, John Messer, David Thompson, Caroline Hunter, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Gregory Fink, Deneen Elise Gardner, Alphonso Wilson and David Emory Roberts
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02538
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Inn-Young Park on Behalf of Defendant Gilead Services, Inc. (Park, Inn-Young) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia Ann Degen on Behalf of Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Elaine Pole on behalf of Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Pole, Debra) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1) filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 Certification of Interested Entities or Parties filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Eugene Anderson on Behalf of Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Case Management Order on Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Document Productions. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 24, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Consolidating Cases For Pretrial Purposesby Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:18-cv-06972-JST. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-06972-JST, 3:19-cv-02538-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 Steve W. Berman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13360845.) filed by Mia J. Abbott, Christopher Michael Abraham, Hosea Allen, Oris Anderson, Ronnette Archelle, Jerome Armstead, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, George Beverly, Jr, John Black, Louverne Boddie, Keri Brady, Kabrodrick Brantley, Shirley Brents, Angela M. Carmouche, Derrick Carr, Kenneth L. Casey, Darrel G. Christ, Jonathan Cole, Marcus Cole, Demica Copelin, Cindy Cowden, Gregory A. Craig, James M. Criswell, Daniel Davis, Daron J. Davis, Patrick Dennis, Valorie Denton, Lisa Renee Devereux, Delores Dodd, Sarah Dugas, Bernell Endsley, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Gregory Fink, Shelia Ford, Arden Frost, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Emile Gainey, Joseph A. Gallow, Deneen Elise Gardner, Jacqueline Garrett, Terry W. Garrett, Lois A. Goetz, Earl Goforth, Debra Gonzalez, Cynthia Gordon, Tiarrence Grayson, Phillip Haggan, Brian Hayes, Patrick Heinze, Walter M. Henry, Timothy Allen Hickle, Keri Hicks, Mark Hicks, Carolyn Howard, Caroline Hunter, Eric Johnson, Derrick Jones, Matthew Jones, David Keach, Ronald Eric King, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Tommy Kinner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Maurice Lee, Evelyn Little, Nigel Luster, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Corey Malone, Patricia Malone, Erma Marzett, Jeffrey May, Charisa Maynard, Mary Wilson McCullen, James McKnight, John Messer, Jamal Metoyer, Kent Monroe, James William Moon, Jr, Wilfredo Morales, Milton L. Mosley, Eunice Murphy, De'Mon Nolan, Lawrence Owens, Prentice Page, William Parker, Robert Patmon, Leander Patrick, Lloyd H. Peoples, Charles Purdie, Durrell Richard, Stephen Riggs, David Emory Roberts, Darlene Robertson, Roy L. Robinson, Myron Rogers, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Shardra Smith, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Cora Spears, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, Stephen J. Spradlin, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Gerald Starks, Trina Sutton, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Joy Taylor, Ethline Thomas, David Thompson, Sam E. Thompson, Renetta C. Tornes, Margaret Turner-Davis, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Lashawn Victor, Constance R. Walker, Benjamin Henry Waters, Levoice Weary, Jr, Robert Welles, Alex Wells, Timothy Whaley, Henry Percival Williams, Jacqueline E. Williams, Patricia A. Williams, Prentice Williams, Alphonso Wilson, Charles Woody, Devonia Young. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Mia J. Abbott, Christopher Michael Abraham, Hosea Allen, Oris Anderson, Ronnette Archelle, Jerome Armstead, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, George Beverly, Jr, John Black, Louverne Boddie, Keri Brady, Kabrodrick Brantley, Shirley Brents, Angela M. Carmouche, Derrick Carr, Kenneth L. Casey, Darrel G. Christ, Jonathan Cole, Marcus Cole, Demica Copelin, Cindy Cowden, Gregory A. Craig, James M. Criswell, Daniel Davis, Daron J. Davis, Patrick Dennis, Valorie Denton, Lisa Renee Devereux, Delores Dodd, Sarah Dugas, Bernell Endsley, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Gregory Fink, Shelia Ford, Arden Frost, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Emile Gainey, Joseph A. Gallow, Deneen Elise Gardner, Jacqueline Garrett, Terry W. Garrett, Lois A. Goetz, Earl Goforth, Debra Gonzalez, Cynthia Gordon, Tiarrence Grayson, Phillip Haggan, Brian Hayes, Patrick Heinze, Walter M. Henry, Timothy Allen Hickle, Keri Hicks, Mark Hicks, Carolyn Howard, Caroline Hunter, Eric Johnson, Derrick Jones, Matthew Jones, David Keach, Ronald Eric King, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Tommy Kinner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Maurice Lee, Evelyn Little, Nigel Luster, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Corey Malone, Patricia Malone, Erma Marzett, Jeffrey May, Charisa Maynard, Mary Wilson McCullen, James McKnight, John Messer, Jamal Metoyer, Kent Monroe, James William Moon, Jr, Wilfredo Morales, Milton L. Mosley, Eunice Murphy, De'Mon Nolan, Lawrence Owens, Prentice Page, William Parker, Robert Patmon, Leander Patrick, Lloyd H. Peoples, Charles Purdie, Durrell Richard, Stephen Riggs, David Emory Roberts, Darlene Robertson, Roy L. Robinson, Myron Rogers, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Shardra Smith, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Cora Spears, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, Stephen J. Spradlin, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Gerald Starks, Trina Sutton, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Joy Taylor, Ethline Thomas, David Thompson, Sam E. Thompson, Renetta C. Tornes, Margaret Turner-Davis, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Lashawn Victor, Constance R. Walker, Benjamin Henry Waters, Levoice Weary, Jr, Robert Welles, Alex Wells, Timothy Whaley, Henry Percival Williams, Jacqueline E. Williams, Patricia A. Williams, Prentice Williams, Alphonso Wilson, Charles Woody, Devonia Young and Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wilfredo Morales, Debra Gonzalez, Maurice Lee, Stephen J. Spradlin, Keri Brady, Phillip Haggan, Cindy Cowden, Valorie Denton, Charles Woody, Erma Marzett, Jacqueline E. Williams, Margaret Turner-Davis, Darrel G. Christ, James M. Criswell, Oris Anderson, Cora Spears, Ronnette Archelle, Matthew Jones, De'Mon Nolan, Deneen Elise Gardner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Lisa Renee Devereux, Myron Rogers, Robert Patmon, David Emory Roberts, Jonathan Cole, Shelia Ford, James McKnight, Charles Purdie, Louverne Boddie, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Leander Patrick, Jerome Armstead, Joy Taylor, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Christopher Michael Abraham, Roy L. Robinson, Marcus Cole, Charisa Maynard, Kenneth L. Casey, Sarah Dugas, Gerald Starks, Daniel Davis, Prentice Williams, Trina Sutton, Lloyd H. Peoples, Timothy Allen Hickle, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Patricia A. Williams, Walter M. Henry, Evelyn Little, Bernell Endsley, Patricia Malone, Derrick Jones, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Eric Johnson, Angela M. Carmouche, Delores Dodd, John Black, Corey Malone, Benjamin Henry Waters, Daron J. Davis, Lois A. Goetz, Terry W. Garrett, Patrick Dennis, Keri Hicks, Lashawn Victor, Jeffrey May, Ronald Eric King, Shirley Brents, Milton L. Mosley, Prentice Page, Brian Hayes, Shardra Smith, Mia J. Abbott, George Beverly, Jr, Robert Welles, Mary Wilson McCullen, Levoice Weary, Jr, Tommy Kinner, Gregory A. Craig, Durrell Richard, John Messer, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Earl Goforth, Caroline Hunter, Henry Percival Williams, Jamal Metoyer, Joseph A. Gallow, Ethline Thomas, Constance R. Walker, Jacqueline Garrett, Kent Monroe, Kabrodrick Brantley, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Stephen Riggs, David Thompson, Patrick Heinze, William Parker, Darlene Robertson, David Keach, Tiarrence Grayson, Lawrence Owens, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, James William Moon, Jr, Hosea Allen, Timothy Whaley, Cynthia Gordon, Emile Gainey, Eunice Murphy, Carolyn Howard, Renetta C. Tornes, Arden Frost, Mark Hicks, Derrick Carr, Alex Wells, Nigel Luster, Gregory Fink, Sam E. Thompson, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Devonia Young, Alphonso Wilson, Demica Copelin. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #5 Robert Carl Hilliard's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Katrina Ashley's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert C. Hilliard (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13350594) filed by Mia J. Abbott, Christopher Michael Abraham, Hosea Allen, Oris Anderson, Ronnette Archelle, Jerome Armstead, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, George Beverly, Jr, John Black, Louverne Boddie, Keri Brady, Kabrodrick Brantley, Shirley Brents, Angela M. Carmouche, Derrick Carr, Kenneth L. Casey, Darrel G. Christ, Jonathan Cole, Marcus Cole, Demica Copelin, Cindy Cowden, Gregory A. Craig, James M. Criswell, Daniel Davis, Daron J. Davis, Patrick Dennis, Valorie Denton, Lisa Renee Devereux, Delores Dodd, Sarah Dugas, Bernell Endsley, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Gregory Fink, Shelia Ford, Arden Frost, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Emile Gainey, Joseph A. Gallow, Deneen Elise Gardner, Jacqueline Garrett, Terry W. Garrett, Lois A. Goetz, Earl Goforth, Debra Gonzalez, Cynthia Gordon, Tiarrence Grayson, Phillip Haggan, Brian Hayes, Patrick Heinze, Walter M. Henry, Timothy Allen Hickle, Keri Hicks, Mark Hicks, Carolyn Howard, Caroline Hunter, Eric Johnson, Derrick Jones, Matthew Jones, David Keach, Ronald Eric King, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Tommy Kinner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Maurice Lee, Evelyn Little, Nigel Luster, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Corey Malone, Patricia Malone, Erma Marzett, Jeffrey May, Charisa Maynard, Mary Wilson McCullen, James McKnight, John Messer, Jamal Metoyer, Kent Monroe, James William Moon, Jr, Wilfredo Morales, Milton L. Mosley, Eunice Murphy, De'Mon Nolan, Lawrence Owens, Prentice Page, William Parker, Robert Patmon, Leander Patrick, Lloyd H. Peoples, Charles Purdie, Durrell Richard, Stephen Riggs, David Emory Roberts, Darlene Robertson, Roy L. Robinson, Myron Rogers, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Shardra Smith, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Cora Spears, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, Stephen J. Spradlin, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Gerald Starks, Trina Sutton, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Joy Taylor, Ethline Thomas, David Thompson, Sam E. Thompson, Renetta C. Tornes, Margaret Turner-Davis, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Lashawn Victor, Constance R. Walker, Benjamin Henry Waters, Levoice Weary, Jr, Robert Welles, Alex Wells, Timothy Whaley, Henry Percival Williams, Jacqueline E. Williams, Patricia A. Williams, Prentice Williams, Alphonso Wilson, Charles Woody, Devonia Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Katrina Ashley (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-13350572) filed by Mia J. Abbott, Christopher Michael Abraham, Hosea Allen, Oris Anderson, Ronnette Archelle, Jerome Armstead, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, George Beverly, Jr, John Black, Louverne Boddie, Keri Brady, Kabrodrick Brantley, Shirley Brents, Angela M. Carmouche, Derrick Carr, Kenneth L. Casey, Darrel G. Christ, Jonathan Cole, Marcus Cole, Demica Copelin, Cindy Cowden, Gregory A. Craig, James M. Criswell, Daniel Davis, Daron J. Davis, Patrick Dennis, Valorie Denton, Lisa Renee Devereux, Delores Dodd, Sarah Dugas, Bernell Endsley, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Gregory Fink, Shelia Ford, Arden Frost, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Emile Gainey, Joseph A. Gallow, Deneen Elise Gardner, Jacqueline Garrett, Terry W. Garrett, Lois A. Goetz, Earl Goforth, Debra Gonzalez, Cynthia Gordon, Tiarrence Grayson, Phillip Haggan, Brian Hayes, Patrick Heinze, Walter M. Henry, Timothy Allen Hickle, Keri Hicks, Mark Hicks, Carolyn Howard, Caroline Hunter, Eric Johnson, Derrick Jones, Matthew Jones, David Keach, Ronald Eric King, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Tommy Kinner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Maurice Lee, Evelyn Little, Nigel Luster, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Corey Malone, Patricia Malone, Erma Marzett, Jeffrey May, Charisa Maynard, Mary Wilson McCullen, James McKnight, John Messer, Jamal Metoyer, Kent Monroe, James William Moon, Jr, Wilfredo Morales, Milton L. Mosley, Eunice Murphy, De'Mon Nolan, Lawrence Owens, Prentice Page, William Parker, Robert Patmon, Leander Patrick, Lloyd H. Peoples, Charles Purdie, Durrell Richard, Stephen Riggs, David Emory Roberts, Darlene Robertson, Roy L. Robinson, Myron Rogers, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Shardra Smith, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Cora Spears, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, Stephen J. Spradlin, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Gerald Starks, Trina Sutton, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Joy Taylor, Ethline Thomas, David Thompson, Sam E. Thompson, Renetta C. Tornes, Margaret Turner-Davis, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Lashawn Victor, Constance R. Walker, Benjamin Henry Waters, Levoice Weary, Jr, Robert Welles, Alex Wells, Timothy Whaley, Henry Percival Williams, Jacqueline E. Williams, Patricia A. Williams, Prentice Williams, Alphonso Wilson, Charles Woody, Devonia Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (with jury demand) (no process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13339663). Filed by Wilfredo Morales, Debra Gonzalez, Maurice Lee, Stephen J. Spradlin, Keri Brady, Phillip Haggan, Cindy Cowden, Valorie Denton, Charles Woody, Erma Marzett, Jacqueline E. Williams, Margaret Turner-Davis, Darrel G. Christ, James M. Criswell, Oris Anderson, Cora Spears, Ronnette Archelle, Matthew Jones, De'Mon Nolan, Deneen Elise Gardner, Bruce Kleinschmidt, Lisa Renee Devereux, Myron Rogers, Robert Patmon, David Emory Roberts, Jonathan Cole, Shelia Ford, James McKnight, Charles Purdie, Louverne Boddie, Jeffrey K. Spreen, Lance Bartholomew, Pedro A. Benitez, Mary Rebecca Souslin, Leander Patrick, Jerome Armstead, Joy Taylor, Aaron Kenneth Taylor, Christopher Michael Abraham, Roy L. Robinson, Marcus Cole, Charisa Maynard, Kenneth L. Casey, Sarah Dugas, Gerald Starks, Daniel Davis, Prentice Williams, Trina Sutton, Lloyd H. Peoples, Timothy Allen Hickle, Dale Cornelius Sharp, Patricia A. Williams, Walter M. Henry, Evelyn Little, Bernell Endsley, Patricia Malone, Derrick Jones, Stephen Terrell Gaines, Eric Johnson, Angela M. Carmouche, Delores Dodd, John Black, Corey Malone, Benjamin Henry Waters, Daron J. Davis, Lois A. Goetz, Terry W. Garrett, Patrick Dennis, Keri Hicks, Lashawn Victor, Jeffrey May, Ronald Eric King, Shirley Brents, Milton L. Mosley, Prentice Page, Brian Hayes, Shardra Smith, Mia J. Abbott, George Beverly, Jr, Robert Welles, Mary Wilson McCullen, Levoice Weary, Jr, Tommy Kinner, Gregory A. Craig, Durrell Richard, John Messer, Patricia Denise Kinnard, Earl Goforth, Caroline Hunter, Henry Percival Williams, Jamal Metoyer, Joseph A. Gallow, Ethline Thomas, Constance R. Walker, Jacqueline Garrett, Kent Monroe, Kabrodrick Brantley, Aaron Jerome Lyons, Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen, Stephen Riggs, David Thompson, Patrick Heinze, William Parker, Darlene Robertson, David Keach, Tiarrence Grayson, Lawrence Owens, E. Sanchel Spears, Margaret Spencer, James William Moon, Jr, Hosea Allen, Timothy Whaley, Cynthia Gordon, Emile Gainey, Eunice Murphy, Carolyn Howard, Renetta C. Tornes, Arden Frost, Mark Hicks, Derrick Carr, Alex Wells, Nigel Luster, Gregory Fink, Sam E. Thompson, Jerry Brad Vandergriff, Devonia Young, Alphonso Wilson, Demica Copelin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cole
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wilson McCullen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Spencer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentice Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Turner-Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shardra Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Black
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Howard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James William Moon, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Criswell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisa Maynard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Hicks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Monroe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Murphy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gordon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levoice Weary, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McKnight
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Patrick
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arden Frost
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance R. Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Mon Nolan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey K. Spreen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Ford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Dodd
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashawn Victor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Garrett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louverne Boddie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Rogers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Cole
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Sanchel Spears
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Percival Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Casey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durrell Richard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hicks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel Luster
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Welles
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Whaley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam E. Thompson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Haggan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Eric King
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Sutton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Lee
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Henry Waters
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Brady
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valorie Denton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jerome Lyons
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Spears
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A. Goetz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Carr
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Malone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Little
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Beverly, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy L. Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Cowden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dugas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnette Archelle
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renetta C. Tornes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oris Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daron J. Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Armstead
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Parker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Goforth
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia J. Abbott
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Woody
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Michael Abraham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Owens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Cornelius Sharp
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keach
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Starks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Carmouche
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Brents
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Terrell Gaines
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethline Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentice Page
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter M. Henry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Kleinschmidt
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hayes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernell Endsley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Allen Hickle
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Morales
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Craig
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonia Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Spradlin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Malone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demica Copelin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Gallow
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton L. Mosley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd H. Peoples
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dennis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Brad Vandergriff
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Heinze
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emile Gainey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Purdie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro A. Benitez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Gonzalez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiarrence Grayson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Denise Kinnard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Metoyer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey May
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Robertson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Bartholomew
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel G. Christ
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Kinner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Taylor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rebecca Souslin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Wells
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Rodney Leon Fitzgerald McCullen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Renee Devereux
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabrodrick Brantley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Marzett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Patmon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry W. Garrett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Riggs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline E. Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Messer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Hunter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kenneth Taylor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Fink
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deneen Elise Gardner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Emory Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Inn-Young Park
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Represented By: Debra Elaine Pole
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?