Duggan et al v. Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
Plaintiff: Lori Luciano, Ken Petrovcik, Jocelyn Jamelo, Lori Myers, Avraham Isac Zelig, Amar Mody, Colleen McQuade, James Borruso, Robert McQuade, Anthony Luciano, Fidel Jamelo, Tara Duggan, Megan Kiihne, Angela Cosgrove, Robert Nugent and Heena Mody
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Tri-Union Seafoods LLC a California Company doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02562
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #28 Stipulated Request For Order Extending Time For Defendant Tri-Union Seafoods, Llc To File And Serve Its Response To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint And Vacating Case Management Conference.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For Order Extending Time For Defendant Tri-Union Seafoods, Llc To File And Serve Its Response To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint And Vacating Case Management Conference filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. Filed by Jocelyn Jamelo, Lori Luciano, Lori Myers, Tara Duggan, Avraham Isac Zelig, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Angela Cosgrove, James Borruso, Ken Petrovcik, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Robert Nugent, Robert McQuade, Fidel Jamelo, Colleen McQuade. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Penny. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Penny, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13424647) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Penny, Brian) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AND SERVEAMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, LLC TO FILE ANDSERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND MOTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS'COMPLAINT OR AMENDEDCOMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Amended Complaint due by 6/17/2019. Response due by 8/2/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Plaintiffs To File And Serve Amended Complaint And Defendant Tri-Union Seafoods, Llc To File And Serve Responsive Pleadings And Motions To Plaintiffs Complaint Or Amended Complaint filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Brown.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13396376) filed by James Borruso, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik. (Brown, Brian) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Corporate Creations Network as Registered Agent on 05/21/2019, filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due on 8/14/2019 by 5 p.m. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (mllS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bradley M. Beall. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Gold. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart Davidson. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Carrie Laliberte. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elaine Ryan. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Bradley M. Beall, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13353479) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Beall, Bradley) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christopher C. Gold, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13353359) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Gold, Christopher) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Stuart A. Davidson, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13353285) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13352501) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Laliberte, Carrie) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13352470) filed by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig. (Ryan, Elaine) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Borruso, Angela Cosgrove, Tara Duggan, Fidel Jamelo, Jocelyn Jamelo, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Lori Luciano, Colleen McQuade, Robert McQuade, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Lori Myers, Robert Nugent, Ken Petrovcik, Avraham Isac Zelig.. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: (1) Violation of the Unfair Competition Law, Business and Professions Code Section 17200 et seq.; (2) Violation of the Consumers Legal Remedies Act, Civil Code Section 1750 et seq.; (3) Violation of Florida Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act-Fla. Stat. Sections 501.201, et seq.,; (4) Violation of the New York General Business Law Section 349; (5) Violation of the New Jersey Consumer Fraud Act, Section 56:8-2.10; (6) Violation of the Minnesota Prevention of Consumer Fraud Act (Unfair Practices)-Minn.Stat. Sections 325F.68, et seq. and Minn. Stat. 8.31, et seq.; (7) Violation of the Minnesota Prevention of Consumer Fraud Act (False Statement in Advertising)-Minn.Stat. Section 325F.67, et seq.; (8) Violation of the Minnesota Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act-Minn.Stat. Section 325D.43, et seq.; (9) Unjust Enrichment; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13344080). Filed by Jocelyn Jamelo, Lori Luciano, Lori Myers, Tara Duggan, Avraham Isac Zelig, Megan Kiihne, Anthony Luciano, Angela Cosgrove, James Borruso, Ken Petrovcik, Amar Mody, Heena Mody, Robert Nugent, Robert McQuade, Fidel Jamelo & Colleen McQuade. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 5/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duggan et al v. Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Luciano
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Petrovcik
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Jamelo
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Myers
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avraham Isac Zelig
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amar Mody
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen McQuade
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Borruso
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McQuade
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Luciano
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Jamelo
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Duggan
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Kiihne
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cosgrove
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nugent
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heena Mody
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Brian M Brown
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Matthew Beall
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Union Seafoods LLC a California Company doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?