Staley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Staley, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Robert J. Vazquez, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Steve Fuller, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Jason Walker, Jacob Zydonis, Michael Warner, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Gabriel Molina, John Doe, Michael Snipe, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Josh McDonald, John Carroll, Troy Vazquez-Cain and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc., E. R. Squibb & Sons, LLC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Gilead Sciences, LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Japan Tobacco Inc., Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Akros Pharma Inc., Gilead Holdings, LLC, Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc and Janssen R&D Ireland
Case Number: 3:2019cv02573
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 118 COMPLAINT Corrected Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byMichael Warner, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund, Michael Snipe, Josh McDonald, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Jacob Zydonis, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Troy Vazquez-Cain, Gabriel Molina, Jason Walker, Steve Fuller, Peter Staley, John Carroll, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Robert J. Vazquez, John Doe. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 117 STIPULATION TO FILE CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis, Michael Snipe, John Carroll, Josh McDonald, John Doe, Gabriel Molina, and Troy Vazquez-Cain, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Retirees Benefit Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Defendants Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences, LLC, and Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C, Japan Tobacco Inc, Janssen R&D Ireland and Johnson & Johnson . (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13632723.) filed by John Carroll, John Doe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by John Carroll, John Doe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain. (Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Kent Ostrander (Ostrander, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 111 Statement of Non-Opposition re #100 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel / Defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed byGilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to #106 Notice, Motion hearing re #100 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel is MOVED from 8/22/2019 to 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Time for Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #104 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #103 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis re #100 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Frazar Wright Thomas ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13543747.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Hilliard ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13543706.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Richard Brunell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540688.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brunell, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING (with modification) #101 Joint Stipulation and Order to Reschedule Case Management Conference and to Set Page Limitations for Briefing of Motions to Dismiss.Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Defendants' Dispositive Motion due by 9/6/2019. Plaintiffs' Opposition/Response due by 10/18/2019. Defendants' Reply due by 11/22/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Reschedule Case Management Conference and to Set Page Limitations for Briefing of Motions to Dismiss filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/1/2019. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Class Counsel, #2 Declaration of Daralyn J. Durie, #3 Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen, #4 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #5 Proposed Order)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael J. Gallagher, Jr..(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13514465.) filed by John Carroll, John Doe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain. (Gallagher, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve D. Shadowen (Shadowen, Steve) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 96 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E. R. Squibb & Sons, LLC, Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC, Janssen R&D Ireland, Japan Tobacco Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc.. Filed by Michael Warner, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Steve Fuller, Peter Staley, Jason Walker, Robert J. Vazquez. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc. and Akros Pharma Inc. by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE: As part of the initial case management conference statement, Plaintiffs shall address the issue of interim class counsel and the leadership structure (if any) for interim class counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER RELATING CASE. 5:19-cv-3311-BLF related to 3:19-cv-2573-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #89 Stipulation to Consolidate Complaints.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #88 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 90 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/28/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Complaints filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #71 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by Robert J. Vazquez, Michael Warner, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Jason Walker, Jacob Zydonis, Steve Fuller, Brenda Emily Goodrow. Answer due 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Ricque Howard of Ashley L. Shively (Howard, Brianna) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Ricque Howard of Thomas J. Yoo (Howard, Brianna) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jerome W. Hoffman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450555.) filed by Akros Pharma Inc., Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Howard, Brianna) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Neal N. Beaton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450491.) filed by Akros Pharma Inc., Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc. (Howard, Brianna) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Donald Sean Nation ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450451.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve D. Shadowen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450424.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas William Shadowen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450399.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew C. Weiner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13450325.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RELATING CASE 3:19-cv-3142-WHA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #64 Stipulation, filed by Robert J. Vazquez, Michael Warner, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Jason Walker, Jacob Zydonis, Steve Fuller, Brenda Emily Goodrow. Answer due 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 69 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relating Case 3:19-cv-03142 filed by Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13427503.) filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13427409.) filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 64 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 #Electronic filing error re: #54 Joinder filed by Peter Staley. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety using << (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13425545.) filed by Peter Staley. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13425308.) filed by Peter Staley. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13424087.) filed by Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #44 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. Case related to 19-cv-02734-BLF. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13422701.) filed by Peter Staley. (Attachments: #1 Berman - Pro Hac Vice, #2 Solbol - Pro Hac Vice)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/10/2019); attachments filed improperly - please see documents #59 and #60 Modified on 6/11/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 54 Joinder Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Peter Staley. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jeffrey Riehle (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13410826.) filed by Johnson & Johnson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING)(Saint-Antoine, Paul) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13410755.) filed by Johnson & Johnson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING)(Lewers, Joanne) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis (Huttinger, W.) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Natalie Finkelman Bennett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13405856.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Bennett, Natalie) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 44 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Michael Snipe, John Carroll, Josh McDonald, John Doe, Gabriel Molina, Troy Vazquez-Cain. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Snipe et al. v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis (Huttinger, W.) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis re #35 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #39 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #38 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #37 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #34 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #40 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #30 Notice of Appearance, #33 Case Management Scheduling Order, #26 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #24 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #41 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #36 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Huttinger, W.) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13378062.) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E. R. Squibb & Sons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hong, Cindy) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13378019.) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E. R. Squibb & Sons, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shores, Laura) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Asimow < E. R. Squibb < Sons, L.L.C.] (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13375546.) filed by Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund. (Germaine, David) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13375373.) filed by Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund. (Rodriguez, Alberto) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13375271.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker. (Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Ols ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13370688.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ols, Michael) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jayne A. Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13366210.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 CertificateS of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Jayne) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.

May 15, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Paul Ethan Slater ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13352409.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel Evan Rubenstein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13352390.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John Daniel Radice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13352364.) filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Henry Huttinger (Huttinger, W.) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Miller (Miller, Laura) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Lemley (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Floyd McGowan (McGowan, David) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis identifying Corporate Parent FORT LAUDERDALE LODGE 31, INSURANCE TRUST FUND for Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund; Corporate Parent Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund for Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund identifying Corporate Parent Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund for Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Steve Fuller, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Peter Staley, Robert J. Vazquez, Jason Walker, Michael Warner, Jacob Zydonis identifying Corporate Parent Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund for Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13344907.). Filed byMichael Warner, Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund, Brenda Emily Goodrow, Jacob Zydonis, Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund, Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD, Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD, Steve Fuller, Peter Staley, Jason Walker, Robert J. Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 5/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Staley
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg S. Gonsalves, PhD
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Emily Goodrow
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Vazquez
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union, Local No. 1 Health Fund
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Eamon Padraic Kelly
Represented By: David Paul Germaine
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Fuller
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew R. Spieldenner, PhD
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Walker
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Zydonis
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Warner
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Mark Alan Lemley
Represented By: David Floyd McGowan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Michael Patrick Ols
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Gregory T Arnold
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Represented By: Richard M Brunell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Molina
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Snipe
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund
Represented By: Heidi M Silton
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Jessica N. Servais
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh McDonald
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carroll
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Vazquez-Cain
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gallagher, Jr
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Matthew C. Weiner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Donald Sean Nation
Represented By: Nicholas William Shadowen
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Frazar Wright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: Paul Hewit Saint-Antoine
Represented By: Joanne Celia Lewers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. R. Squibb & Sons, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: Cindy Yuanjia Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Peter J. Carney
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Heather K. McDevitt
Represented By: Jeremy Kent Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Peter J. Carney
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Heather K. McDevitt
Represented By: Jeremy Kent Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Ireland UC
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Peter J. Carney
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Heather K. McDevitt
Represented By: Jeremy Kent Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akros Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jerome W Hoffman
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Shively
Represented By: Brianna Ricque Howard
Represented By: John Palmer Kern
Represented By: Neal N. Beaton
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Peter J. Carney
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Heather K. McDevitt
Represented By: Jeremy Kent Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco International U.S.A. Inc
Represented By: Jerome W Hoffman
Represented By: Ashley Lynn Shively
Represented By: Brianna Ricque Howard
Represented By: John Palmer Kern
Represented By: Neal N. Beaton
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen R&D Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?