Zepeda-Fernandez v. GEICO General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Arnold Zepeda-Fernandez
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02693
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GEICO General Insurance Company.. (Burns, John) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEICO General Insurance Company re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines , Standing Orders (2) and Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Burns, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for GEICO General Insurance Company. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Burns, John) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEICO General Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Declaration In Support, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits and EF Registration Information (Burns, John) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION from Alameda County Superior Court. (No Process). Their case number is RG19012125. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13359351). Filed byGEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Burns, John) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda-Fernandez v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Francis Burns
Represented By: John T. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Zepeda-Fernandez
Represented By: John Fitzpatrick Vannucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?