Hershowitz v. Tetra Tech EC, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jonah S. Hershowitz
Defendant: Emile Haddad, Tetra Tech, Inc., Bill Dougherty, Nick Zaferes, Tetra Tech EC, Inc., FivePoint Holdings LLC, HPS1 Block 50 LLC and Lennar Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02698
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato per related case order. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/12/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by FivePoint Holdings LLC, Jonah S. Hershowitz, Lennar Corporation, HPS1 Block 50 LLC, Nick Zaferes, Tetra Tech EC, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc., Emile Haddad, Bill Dougherty. (Wickersham, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. Proof of Filing in State Court of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on: Tetra Tech, Inc.; Tetra Tech EC, Inc.; Lennar Corporation; HPS1 Blook 50 LLC; FivePoint Holdings, LLC; Bill Dougherty; Nick Zaferes and Emile Haddad by Jonah S. Hershowitz (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate/Proof of Service. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #8 Notice (Other) filed by Jonah S. Hershowitz (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proof of Service by Jonah S. Hershowitz re #6 Order (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/20/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Tech, Inc. for Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Tech, Inc., Other Affiliate United States Navy for Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-19-575036. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13359566). Filed by Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hershowitz v. Tetra Tech EC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emile Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Pittman
Represented By: Davina Pujari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Dougherty
Represented By: Richard Martin Steingard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Zaferes
Represented By: Madhu Reddy Pocha
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Geoffrey Hurndall Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech EC, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Pittman
Represented By: Davina Pujari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FivePoint Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey David Dintzer
Represented By: Matthew Chase Wickersham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPS1 Block 50 LLC
Represented By: Madhu Reddy Pocha
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Geoffrey Hurndall Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Madhu Reddy Pocha
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Geoffrey Hurndall Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah S. Hershowitz
Represented By: Donald James Magilligan
Represented By: Julie Lynn Fieber
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?