Snipe et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Snipe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, John Doe, Troy Vazquez-Cain and John Carroll
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Gilead Sciences, LLC, Janssen R&D Ireland, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc., Japan Tobacco, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Akros Pharma Inc., Gilead Holdings, LLC and E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02734
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: As part of the initial case management conference statement, Plaintiffs shall address the issue of interim class counsel and the leadership structure (if any) for interim class counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation to Consolidate Complaints.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Complaints filed by John Carroll, John Doe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain. (Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen per related case order. Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE. Related to: 19-cv-2573-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for discovery matters. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 7, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (Attachments: #1 Standing Orders for Judge Chesney, #2 Order for All Judges)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Carroll, John Doe, Josh McDonald, Gabriel Molina, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain.. (Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Akros Pharma Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C., Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC, Janssen R&D Ireland, Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc., Japan Tobacco, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2019. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Akros Pharma Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C., Gilead Holdings, LLC, Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC, Janssen R&D Ireland, Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc., Japan Tobacco, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13362633.). Filed by John Carroll, Michael Snipe, Troy Vazquez-Cain, Josh McDonald, John Doe, Gabriel Molina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruf, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/21/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snipe et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Snipe
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh McDonald
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Molina
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Vazquez-Cain
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carroll
Represented By: Kevin Francis Ruf
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen R&D Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Ireland UC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco International U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Tobacco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akros Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. R. Squibb & Sons, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?