Ramos et al v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: Yolanda Vallejo Medrano, Floricel Liborio Ramos, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez and Maria Valdovinos Diaz
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02757
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that the case are related: C18-4105 LB and C19-2757 JD. In ECF No. 41, Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. consented to MJ LB jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/08/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/1/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc... (Dorny, A.) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Eugene Davis on behalf of Defendant G4s Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. (Davis, Calvin) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byG4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Dorny, A.) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria Valdovinos Diaz, Yolanda Vallejo Medrano, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez, Floricel Liborio Ramos.. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maria Valdovinos Diaz, Yolanda Vallejo Medrano, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez, Floricel Liborio Ramos re #6 Notice of Appearance, #10 Summons Issued, #5 Notice of Appearance, #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, 7 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Andrea L. Scripa's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Andrea L. Scripa ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13368769.) filed by Maria Valdovinos Diaz, Yolanda Vallejo Medrano, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez, Floricel Liborio Ramos. (Scripa, Andrea) (Filed on 5/21/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lorraine Crook (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Shichen Ong (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayes Phillips Hyde (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Assault, Battery, Negligence, and Negligent and Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Under California State Law against G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13366688.). Filed byFloricel Liborio Ramos, Yolanda Vallejo Medrano, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez, Maria Valdovinos Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 5/21/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Vallejo Medrano
Represented By: Andrea L. Scripa
Represented By: Hayes Phillips Hyde
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Andrew Shichen Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floricel Liborio Ramos
Represented By: Andrea L. Scripa
Represented By: Hayes Phillips Hyde
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Andrew Shichen Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez
Represented By: Andrea L. Scripa
Represented By: Hayes Phillips Hyde
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Andrew Shichen Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valdovinos Diaz
Represented By: Andrea L. Scripa
Represented By: Hayes Phillips Hyde
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Jamie Lorraine Crook
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Andrew Shichen Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Represented By: A. Louis Dorny
Represented By: Calvin Eugene Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?