Farriot v. TPG Capital Corporation
Plaintiff: Irvin Farriot
Defendant: TPG Capital Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02776
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by TPG C apital Corporation The Correct E-filing Event is Request not Notice. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR AND CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY & [PROPOSED] ORDER; by Elisa Nadeau Request for and Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Nadeau, Elisa) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Notice of Removal) ; by TPG Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/28/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TPG Capital Corporation re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,,, (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TPG Capital Corporation Correct Alias Name. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to revi ew General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TPG Capital Corporation re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TPG Capital Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by TPG Capital Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TPG VII Wolfhound Holdings, L.P. for TPG Capital Corporation. on behalf of Wind River Systems, Inc. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT; (NO PROCESS); from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19011554. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13368976). Filed byTPG Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 5/21/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farriot v. TPG Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Capital Corporation
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Represented By: Elisa Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Farriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?