Venture General Agency, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Plaintiff: Venture General Agency, LLC and Old American County Mutual Fire Insurance Co.
Defendant: Venture General Agency, LLC and Old American County Mutual Fire Insruance Company, Does 1 to 25, Inclusive and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02778
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Vukovic, Adam) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed by Old American County Mutual Fire Insurance Company;and filed byVenture General Agency, LLC. (Serot, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Venture General Agency, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Serot, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 7/9/2019. Replies due by 7/16/2019. (Vukovic, Adam) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Vukovic, Adam) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Venture General Agency, LLC.. (Serot, Daniel) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 to 25, Inclusive, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13369128.). Filed byVenture General Agency, LLC and Old American County Mutual Fire Insruance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Serot, Daniel) (Filed on 5/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venture General Agency, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture General Agency, LLC and Old American County Mutual Fire Insruance Company
Represented By: Daniel Albert Serot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Adam Andrew Vukovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture General Agency, LLC
Represented By: Nicolet Corliss
Represented By: Daniel Albert Serot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old American County Mutual Fire Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?