Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Heredia et al

Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Julio Heredia and Cintya Heredia
Case Number: 3:2019cv02784
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #10 Summons Issued Proof of Service re: Julio Heredia (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. Cintya Heredia served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Cintya Heredia, Julio Heredia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re: Case Management Conference Order (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Innovative Sports Management, Inc... (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Julio Heredia. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Cintya Heredia. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. The court wil l not issue blank proposed summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file completed forms in their entirety. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cintya Heredia, Julio Heredia (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13370184.). Filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Heredia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintya Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?