Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Bernhardt et al Featured Case

The Center for Biological Diversity and San Francisco Baykeeper filed this lawsuit against the Trump administration, alleging that it is failing to protect several "highly imperiled" species of animals across the country, in violation of the the Endangered Species Act.

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. and San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: David Bernhardt and Margaret Everson
Case Number: 3:2019cv02843
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/6/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Electronic filing error Re: 1 Proposed Summonses filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., San Francisco Baykeeper. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Wrong Clerk of Court listed on forms (should be Susan Y. Soong). This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file correct forms for issuance using <Civil><Other Filings><Other Documents><Proposed Summons> (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13375333.) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., San Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Atwood, Amy) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., San Francisco Baykeeper (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13373596.). Filed byCenter for Biological Diversity, Inc., San Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Rae Atwood
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Loda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Amy Rae Atwood
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Loda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?