County of Santa Clara et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Trust Women Seattle, Medical Students For Choice, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Robert Bolan, Colleen McNicholas, AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ+ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Center On Halsted, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Hartford Gyn Center, Randy Pumphrey, Sarah Henn, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc., Ward Carpenter, Mazzoni Center, County of Santa Clara, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights doing business as GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality and Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc. doing business as Whitman-Walker Health
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II
Amicus Curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists and Institute for Policy Integrity
Case Number: 3:2019cv02916
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13547720.) filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selden, Shannon) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13547690.) filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moody, Anna) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 61 Received Document Administrative record re (73 in 3:19-cv-02405-WHA) Notice (Other),. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AS MODIFIED RE (69) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME by Judge William Alsup.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02405-WHA, 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AS MODIFIED RE (70) PRIVACY ACT MOTION. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02405-WHA, 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew Tauber. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13485619.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/2/2019 filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tauber, Andrew) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #48 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO THE ADR MULTI-OPTION PROGRAM by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew Tauber. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13485619.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tauber, Andrew) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re (51 in 3:19-cv-02916-WHA) Order: Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference VACATED (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE STIPULATED REQUEST AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE (64) STIPULATED REQUEST by Judge William Alsup in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING (57) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT by Judge William Alsup in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 48 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Automatic Referral to the ADR Multi-Option Program filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 47 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ADJUST SCHEDULE (denying (50) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA; denying (34) in case 3:19-cv-02769-WHA; denying (45) in case 3:19-cv-02916-WHA) by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 45 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Establish a Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, to Enlarge Time to File Preliminary Injunction Opposition filed by Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Takemoto, #2 Proposed Order)(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE by Judge William Alsup (granting (41) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA, granting (31) in case 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, and granting (42) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Antonia Grab (Grab, Denise) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 42 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Institute for Policy Integrity. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Grab, Denise) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF AND SETTING HEARING FOR 7/17/2019 08:00 AM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order relating Case Numbers C-19-2405 JCS, C-19-02769 HSG and C-19-2916 NC. All three cases shall be randomly assigned to a district judge. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 13, 2019. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc... (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Backus, Lois, #2 Declaration - Barnes, Elizabeth, #3 Declaration - Bolan, Robert, #4 Declaration - Burkhart, Julie, #5 Declaration - Butler, Bruce, #6 Declaration - Carpenter, Ward, #7 Declaration - Cody, Sara, #8 Declaration - Cummings, Darrell, #9 Declaration - Ettner, Randi, #10 Declaration - Harker, Roy, #11 Declaration - Henn, Sarah, #12 Declaration - Lorenz, Paul, #13 Declaration - Manley, Alecia, #14 Declaration - McNicholas, Colleen, #15 Declaration - Miller, Ken, #16 Declaration - Nguyen, Phuong, #17 Declaration - Phelps, Rachael, #18 Declaration - Pumphrey, Randy, #19 Declaration - Shafi, Naseema, #20 Declaration - Shanker, Adrian, #21 Declaration - Singh, Narinder, #22 Declaration - Sproul, Jill, #23 Declaration - Tullys, Toni, #24 Declaration - Valle, Modesto, #25 Declaration - Vargas, Hector, #26 Declaration - Rubin, Lee, #27 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto (Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation on Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, #2 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Pearl Greenberg (Greenberg, Susan) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Kopplin (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Luke Edwards (Edwards, Hannah) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Hanna-Weir (Hanna-Weir, Mary) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Puneet Cheema Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #27 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Puneet Cheema ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13397086.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Cheema, Puneet) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Kenneth Upton Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Richard Katskee Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #11 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Christine Parker Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #10 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Rabia Muqaddam Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Genevieve Scott Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Nicole Saharski Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #7 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Miriam Nemetz Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #6 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Omar Gonzalez-Pagan Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Camilla B. Taylor Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Jamie A. Gliksberg Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #2 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/13/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384520.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Upton, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384485.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Katskee, Richard) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384102.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Parker, Christine) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384077.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Muqaddam, Rabia) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13384036.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scott, Genevieve) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383962.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Saharsky, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383886.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nemetz, Miriam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Omar Gonzalez-Pagan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383275.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Camilla B. Taylor ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383260.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Taylor, Camilla) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jamie A. Gliksberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13383206.) filed by AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Ward Carpenter, Center On Halsted, County of Santa Clara, Hartford Gyn Center, Sarah Henn, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, Colleen McNicholas, Medical Students For Choice, Randy Pumphrey, Trust Women Seattle, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.. (Gliksberg, Jamie) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13382887.). Filed byAGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ Psychiatrists, Center On Halsted, Trust Women Seattle, Sarah Henn, County of Santa Clara, Randy Pumphrey, Ward Carpenter, Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center, Los Angeles LGBT Center, Mazzoni Center, American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights, Robert Bolan, Colleen McNicholas, Hartford Gyn Center, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc., Medical Students For Choice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 5/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Santa Clara et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trust Women Seattle
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Students For Choice
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradbury-Sullivan LGBT Community Center
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bolan
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen McNicholas
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGLP: The Association Of LGBTQ+ Psychiatrists
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center On Halsted
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles LGBT Center
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Gyn Center
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Pumphrey
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Henn
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward Carpenter
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazzoni Center
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Hannah Luke Edwards
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Susan Pearl Greenberg
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Hanna-Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association Of Physicians For Human Rights doing business as GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc. doing business as Whitman-Walker Health
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Rabia Muqaddam
Represented By: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Represented By: Genevieve Scott
Represented By: Camilla B Taylor
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Represented By: Miriam R Nemetz
Represented By: Christine Marie Parker
Represented By: Jamie Avra Gliksberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Anna Augusta Moody
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity
Represented By: Denise Antonia Grab
Represented By: Anna Augusta Moody
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?