Freska Produce International, LLC v. I5 Fresh Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Freska Produce International, LLC, a California limited liability company and Freska Produce International, LLC
Defendant: Yahya Ahmed, Apple Land Produce, Inc., a California corporation, I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc., a California corporation, I5 Fresh Produce, Inc., a California corporation, Mohamed Manea, U.S.A. Produce, Inc., a California corporation, Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc., a California corporation, U.S.A. Produce, Inc., I5 Fresh Produce, Inc., Ahmed Yahya, I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc., Apple Land Produce, Inc. and Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03172
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to defendant U.S.A. Produce, Inc. on August 1, 2019. Agent of service is incorrect, no information as to where summons was served. (Related documents(s) #18 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice: re ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Yahya Ahmed and 15 Fresh Produce, Inc. on August 1, 2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants, I5 Fresh Produce, Inc., Yahya Ahmed a/k/a Ahmed Yahya, and U.S.A. Produce, Inc. filed by Freska Produce International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/30/2019) Modified on 7/31/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint byMohamed Manea. (Webb, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. Yahya Ahmed served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. U.S.A. Produce, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. I5 Fresh Produce, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freska Produce International, LLC. Apple Land Produce, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 06/12/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Yahya Ahmed, Apple Land Produce, Inc., I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc., I5 Fresh Produce, Inc., Mohamed Manea, U.S.A. Produce, Inc., Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Freska Produce International, LLC.. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 ***Incorrect PDF. Re-filed as dkt. #5 .***Proposed Summons. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13415658.). Filed byFreska Produce International, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freska Produce International, LLC v. I5 Fresh Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freska Produce International, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freska Produce International, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahya Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Land Produce, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I5 Fresh Produce, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Manea
Represented By: Matthew John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. Produce, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I5 Fresh Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Yahya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.U. Market & Deli, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Land Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yemen Cafe & Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?