Wang v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Michael Wang
Defendant: Department of Justice and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2019cv03179
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING re #15 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Answer or Respond filed by United States Department of Justice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/16/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time Within Which to Answer or Respond filed by United States Department of Justice. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. Service on the United States Attorney General (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. Service on the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. United States Department of Justice served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/25/2019. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Wang.. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13416421.). Filed by Michael Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wang
Represented By: Nicole A Pifari
Represented By: Nicole A. Pifari
Represented By: Harry S. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?