Dew et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jillian Dew and William Dew
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03257
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Ivankovic Mangarpan as Lead Counsel for Defendant American Airlines, Inc. with Proof of Service (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jillian Dew, William Dew.. (McKay, John) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Airlines, Inc... (Hackett, Adam) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Amerann Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Proof of Service byAmerican Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for JUry Trial)(Hackett, Adam) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.. with Proof of Service (Hackett, Adam) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McKay, John) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jillian Dew, William Dew. American Airlines, Inc. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jillian Dew, William Dew (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against American Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13424623.). Filed by Jillian Dew, William Dew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McKay, John) (Filed on 6/11/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dew et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Dew
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dew
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Christian Hackett
Represented By: Tina Ivankovic Mangarpan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?