Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. New West Cooling Company et al
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Defendant: Dan R. Nicola, New West Cooling Company and Jeff Martinez
Case Number: 3:2019cv03314
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re 9 Clerk's Notice: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaye Diveley (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Dan R. Nicola. Service waived by Dan R. Nicola waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by New West Cooling Company. Service waived by New West Cooling Company waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeff Martinez. Service waived by Jeff Martinez waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Jeff Martinez, New West Cooling Company & Dan R. Nicola. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC.. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injuctive Relief and Civil Penalties and Remediation (Federal Water Pollution Control Act, 33 U.S.C. Section 1251 et seq.) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13429781). Filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Notice Ltr, #2 Exhibit Ex. B SWPPP 043019, #3 Exhibit Ex. C SMARTS Snapshot 061219, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Photographs, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. New West Cooling Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Represented By: Xhavin Sinha
Represented By: Craig Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan R. Nicola
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New West Cooling Company
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Martinez
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?