Ellison v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Donald Keith Ellison
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv03341
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 ****Please Note****Correction made. For future filings please docket in Civil Miscellaneous Case 19-MC-80167-JST. Filing fee of $47.00 due for case 19-MC-80167. Application for Refund form available on our website for filing fee in case 19-cv-3341. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case (United States's Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra ) (United States's Opposition to Motion for aTemporary Restraining Order) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #23 Declaration in Support, (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #20 Stipulation regarding TRO briefing schedule. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting To The Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Seth M. Kruglak in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting to the Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property Served on US Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra nt filed by Donald Keith Ellison and the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra on the U.S. Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra c/o U.S. Attorney's Office, Northern District of California (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property c/o Attorney General of the United States (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TRO/PRELIMINARY INJUCTION. Plaintiff is directed to serve copies of the motion on defendant and file a proof of service. Counsel shall meet and confer to set a briefing schedule and hearing. In the event the parties are not able to agree to a schedule, plaintiff may contact the Court for further assistance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property c/o United States Attorney for the Northern District of California (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property c/o United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warrant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin D. Ball in Support of Ex Parte Motion for a TRO, #2 Declaration of William J. Leone in Support of Ex Parte Motion for a TRO, #3 Proposed Order)(Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Seth Michael Kruglak representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William J. Leone representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Keith Ellison.. (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Seth M. Kruglak ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13434446.) filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - William J. Leone ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13434395.) filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Leone, William) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to return property filed by Donald Keith Ellison. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 6/26/2019. Replies due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #3 Proposed Order, #4 Decl of Donald K Ellison, #5 Decl of William J Leone) (fabS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Keith Ellison
Represented By: William Joseph Leone
Represented By: Seth Micheal Kruglak
Represented By: Robin Dale Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?