Freitas v. Bank Of America

Plaintiff: John B. Freitas
Defendant: Bank Of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv03347
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Acknowledgment of Receipt from US Marshal. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/20/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #14 Order on Motion for TRO: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/19/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/19/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #2 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Remark: Summons and USM-285 Form placed in US Marshals outbox in Clerk's Office Mail Room (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by clerk on 6/14/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/14/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John B. Freitas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John B. Freitas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John B. Freitas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America. Filed by John B. Freitas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?