Express Mobile, Inc. v. Contus Interactive, Inc.

Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Defendant: Contus Interactive, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03350
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Telephonic Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASE (s): C-17-2605 RS; C-19-3350 JSW; C-19-3351 YGR; C-19-3352 RS; C-19-3353 JST; C-19-3355 EJD; C-19-3356 EMC and C-19-3357 JST... Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Express Mobile, Inc.. Contus Interactive, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Contus Interactive, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Express Mobile, Inc. as to Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please Re-file and attach, the ISSUED Summons, which was Signed by the Deputy Clerk, and filed at docket entry #6 on Ju ne 14, 2019. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #12 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Express Mobile, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 ***WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED, SEE DOCKET ENTRY #13 *** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Express Mobile, Inc. as to Express Mobile, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/1/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Express Mobile, Inc... (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Contus Interactive, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. US 6,546,397 B1; US 7,594,168 B2; US 9,471,287 B2; US 9,928,044 B2; US 9,063,755 B2. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Contus Interactive, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13433527.). Filed by Express Mobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Craft, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Mobile, Inc. v. Contus Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Represented By: Robert Dean Kiddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contus Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?