Key v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Gretchen Key
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03366
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #11 Order on Stipulation,,., Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #11 Order on Stipulation,, Opposition due by 8/30/2019. Reply due by 9/13/2019. Motion Hearing reset to 10/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The deadline for plaintiff to file opposition is extended to August 30, 2019, the deadline for defendant to file its reply is extended to September 13, 2019, and the hearing on the motion is continued to October 4, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to November 15, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by BMW of North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Yale Basser (Basser, Ari) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Lurie (Lurie, Jordan) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT BMW'S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW of North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BMW (US) Holding Corp., Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke AG for BMW of North America, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Cho, Dyanne) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-575783. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13434601). Filed byBMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint attached - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kizirian, Eric) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Key
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: Robert L. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?