Afzal-Etebari v. First National Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Mary Afzal-Etebari
Defendant: First National Insurance Company of America and Stanley Steemer of Contra Costa, CA
Case Number: 3:2019cv03387
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Stanley Steemer of Contra Costa, CA by Mary Afzal-Etebari (Veroff, Daniel) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/2/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/12/2019 is reset to 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First National Insurance Company of America.. (Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by First National Insurance Company of America re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support, #5 Certificate of Service, Notice of Related Cases [Civil Local Rule 3-12] (Schulte, Yvonne) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First National Insurance Company of America re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support Defendant's Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff (Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Judicial Notice re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant First National Insurance Company of America's Notice of Removal filed byFirst National Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #3 , #1 , #2 ) (Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by First National Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for First National Insurance Company of America. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support First National Insurance Company of America's Certification of Interested Parties or Person and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of D. Ryan Jankowski in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byFirst National Insurance Company of America. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant First National Insurance Company of America's Notice of Removal from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C 19-00939. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13436016). Filed byFirst National Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afzal-Etebari v. First National Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Afzal-Etebari
Represented By: Daniel Jack Veroff
Represented By: Victor J. Jacobellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Susan Rebecca Koehler Sullivan
Represented By: Yvonne Marie Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Steemer of Contra Costa, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?