Watson v. Checkr, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Edward Watson
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03396
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #24 Stipulation Postponing Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 10/3/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Postponing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Checkr, Inc.. (Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Checkr, Inc. Answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/5/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Checkr, Inc.. (Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Edward Watson. Checkr, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Edward Watson re #19 Case Management Scheduling Order, Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California Contents of Joint Case Management Statement, Civil Standing Order General & Civil Standing Order on Discovery (Brennan, Lauren) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Checkr, Inc.. (Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Checkr, Inc... (Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rod M. Fliegel (Fliegel, Rod) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Brennan. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13460521.) filed by David Edward Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (PA))(Brennan, Lauren) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Soumilas. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James Francis. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13457042.) filed by David Edward Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (PA))(Soumilas, John) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13456981.) filed by David Edward Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (PA))(Francis, James) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Checkr, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by David Edward Watson. Defendant listed on the summons does not match the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by t he clerks office. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Edward Watson.. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Checkr, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13436556.). Filed byDavid Edward Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heath, Erika) (Filed on 6/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Checkr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Represented By: Rod M. Fliegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edward Watson
Represented By: Erika Angelos Heath
Represented By: John Soumilas
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Lauren KW Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?