Feinman v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: James B Feinman
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03397
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Virginia, 7:19-cv-00055, Feinman v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-3397 CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order filed 6/6/19 cc: JPMDL. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00055. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order from Northern District of California; MDL No. 2672 (aab)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Resolution of Motion to Enjoin. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/21/19. (sas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Stay Case by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Abrams, Kenneth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 State Court Records received from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL18-2712. (sas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Stay . filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Abel, Benjamin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Abel, Benjamin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Peter Abel on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Abel, Benjamin)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand . filed by James B. Feinman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion of the Honorable Glen E. Conrad, #2 Exhibit Order dated 10/25/2016, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lien Letter, #4 Exhibit Consumer Class Action Settlement Agreement and Release, #5 Exhibit Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Opinion dated 01/22/2019, #6 Exhibit Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Motion to Enforce 2.0-Liter Settlement Approval Order Enjoining Prohibited State Court Lawsuit Filed by Non-Class Counsel)(Feinman, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by James B. Feinman. (Feinman, James)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL18-2712. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/30/2019. (sas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (sas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number CL18-2712. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt #0423-3059658.), filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - emails, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint & Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint & Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - USDC, CAND Order re: Attorneys' Liens, #5 Exhibit E - USDC, CAND Objection, Motion to Lift Injunction, Application for Attorney's Fees, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feinman v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Feinman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By: Kenneth Walter Abrams
Represented By: Christopher Edward Trible
Represented By: John David Wilburn
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Abel
Represented By: Terrence Mitchell Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?