Ahlstrom v. DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.
Plaintiff: Robert W. Ahlstrom
Defendant: DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03435
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in Support (re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byRobert W. Ahlstrom. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byDHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paula Hunter-Perkins, #2 Declaration Mark C. Winter, #3 Declaration of Jennifer L. Katz, #4 Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert W. Ahlstrom.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of the California Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court)(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. identifying Other Affiliate DHI Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate D.R. Horton, Inc., Other Affiliate DHI Mortgage Company GP, Inc., Other Affiliate DHI Mortgage Company LP, Inc. for DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/ 12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent, #2 Declaration in Support, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of David Morice in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byDHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19012495. (). Filed byDHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Case Management Conference Statement, #3 Exhibit C - Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Filing fee of $400.00 paid with receipt number 0971-13442766. Modified on 6/17/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahlstrom v. DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHI Mortgage Company, LTD., L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsay Katz
Represented By: Alexandra Caroline Aurisch
Represented By: Jack Steven Sholkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Ahlstrom
Represented By: Shaun Setareh
Represented By: Ashley N. Batiste
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: Farrah Grant
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?