Albert D. Seeno Construction Co. v. American International Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Albert D. Seeno Construction Co.
Defendant: American International Specialty Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2019cv03481
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, filed by American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania. (Huang, Kathy) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania. (Naor, Rachel) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Motion to Relate case to 17-cv-3765 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/17/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert D. Seeno Construction Co. of Service of Process on National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert D. Seeno Construction Co. of Service of Process on American Home Assurance Company (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/27/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albert D. Seeno Construction Co... (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Albert D. Seeno Construction Co. . (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Declaratory Relief; Jury Demanded against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400,00, receipt number 0971-13446766). Filed by Albert D. Seeno Construction Co.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #(2) Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #(3) Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #(4) Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #(5) Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #(6) Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #(7) Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint)(Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert D. Seeno Construction Co. v. American International Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert D. Seeno Construction Co.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Rachel Adi Naor
Represented By: Kathy Jan Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Rachel Adi Naor
Represented By: Kathy Jan Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Rachel Adi Naor
Represented By: Kathy Jan Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?