Nightingale et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Maribel Carandang, Courtney McDermed, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa and Zachary Nightingale
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv03512
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13613235.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/22/2019. Replies due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration First Realmuto Dec., #3 Declaration Nightingale Dec. and attachment, #4 Declaration David Dec., #5 Declaration McDermed Dec., #6 Declaration Abrutyn Dec., #7 Declaration Cleveland Dec., #8 Declaration Hall Dec., #9 Declaration Asch Dec., #10 Declaration Taurel Dec. and attachment, #11 Declaration Ellison Dec., #12 Declaration Hansen Dec., #13 Declaration Lee Dec., #14 Declaration Falgout Dec., #15 Declaration Dobrin Dec. and attachments, #16 Declaration Phelps Dec., #17 Declaration Second Realmuto Dec., #18 Declaration Kenney Dec., #19 Declaration Adams Dec., #20 Declaration Tolchin Dec., #21 Exhibit Lopa FOIA Status Check, #22 Exhibit Carandang FOIA Status Check, #23 Proposed Order)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13581757.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Creighton, Emily) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13575738.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Kenney, Mary) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Matt Adams. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Leila Kang. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13545417.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13543976.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Kang, Leila) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale of Case Management Conference Order and Judge Orrick's Standing Order for Civil Cases (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and case initiating documents served on Defendants, Attorney General William Barr, and US Attorney's Office for the Northern District of California on June 25, 2019, filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Motion to Relate Cases (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale.. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/19/2019 is reset to 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Eva Tolchin as co-counsel (Tolchin, Stacy) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale . (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13449903.). Filed byZachary Nightingale, Pao Lopa, Cheryl David, Courtney McDermed, Maribel Carandang. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nightingale et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Carandang
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Emily Jamieson Creighton
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney McDermed
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Emily Jamieson Creighton
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl David
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Emily Jamieson Creighton
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pao Lopa
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Emily Jamieson Creighton
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Nightingale
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Emily Jamieson Creighton
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?