1030 Ohio, LLC v. Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: 1030 Ohio, LLC a California limited liability company and 1030 Ohio, LLC
Defendant: Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC, a California limited liability company, DOES 1-10,, Old Republic Title, a California Corporation, Old Republic Title and Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03555
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: #23 Notice of Dismissal. It is so ordered case voluntarily dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 1030 Ohio, LLC (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 ERRATA re #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Request for Withdrawal of Document No. 21 Filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC. (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 1030 Ohio, LLC (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney admitted to California State Bar.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Stipulation Between Parties Regarding Briefing Schedule for #17 Motion. Opposition due 8/12/2019; reply due 8/18/2019. If settlement is not affected, the parties shall proceed with the motion.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions . Responses due by 8/12/2019. Replies due by 8/18/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 26, 2019 #Reminder to Counsel Re: #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC; Counsel is reminded to please ensure that the correct case number 3:19-cv-3555 EMC is reflected on all future filings pursuant to #7 Order Reassigning Case. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions filed byRubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions filed by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of Douglas Watson in Support of Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Seigel in Support of Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens and for Sanctions, #4 Proposed Order Expunging Lis Pendens and Awarding Sanctions, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule. Hearing rescheduled for 9/5/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC. (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 ERRATA/NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL re #13 Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC. (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 7/16/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlment and Request to Vacate all Currently Set Dates by 1030 Ohio, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed byRubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/17/2019. Replies due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authroties in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement, #2 Declaration of Vance Hillstrom in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement, #3 Proposed Order Dismissing First Amended Complaint, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC re #7 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, Standing Orders (Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, Standing Orders, etc. (Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC re #4 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13476690.) filed by 1030 Ohio, LLC. (Chen, Alexander) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect case number regarding #4 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please ensure that all documents filed have the case number 4:19-cv-03555-DMR. No further action is necessary, please comply on all future filings. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC.. (Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C19-00847. (No Process)(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13452032). Filed byRubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1030 Ohio, LLC v. Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Reilly Dennis Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title, a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubicon Mortgage Fund, LLC
Represented By: Reilly Dennis Wilkinson
Represented By: Jonathan Seigel
Represented By: Spencer Paul Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1030 Ohio, LLC a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1030 Ohio, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Chen
Represented By: William Ralph Walz
Represented By: Elliot Tucker Landreth
Represented By: Theodore Scott Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?