UNITE HERE International Union v. Sky Chefs, Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE International Union
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03604
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/3/2019. An arbitration date has been set. The application #5 for Temporary Restraining Order is dismissed. The evidentiary hearing scheduled for 7/9/2019 is vacated. The initial case management conference is reset for 9/26/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. A joint case management statement due by 9/19/2019. (FTR Time: 10:02-10:03.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Kristin Martin.Attorney for Defendant: Donald Munro. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 24, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #19 Transcript Order, #18 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019. (Related documents(s) #19 , #18 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by UNITE HERE International Union, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Barber, David) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Sky Chefs, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Israel-Trummel, Kelsey) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 6/24/2019. Parties advised the Court that they have agreed to the terms of expedited arbitration in a written agreement, but they do not have a date yet as the arbitrator is out of the office until 6/25/19. Defendant also stated on the record how it is currently enforcing the policy at issue. Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on July 9. The court will hold a telephone case management conference with the parties at 10:00 a.m. on July 3, 2019. The parties shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (FTR 2:36-3:15; 4:31-4:40) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Kristin Martin; David Barber.Attorneys for Defendant: Donald Munro; Kelsey Israel-Trummel.For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Don Munro. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Donald J. Munro ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13461992.) filed by Sky Chefs, Inc.. (Munro, Donald) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support (re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ) filed by UNITE HERE International Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Hendricks with Exhibits A-B, #2 Declaration of Kristin L. Martin with Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Eric B. Myers)(Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 22, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Jerrold Glass in Support of #11 Opposition/Response to Motion,, for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed bySky Chefs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Israel-Trummel, Kelsey) (Filed on 6/22/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sky Chefs, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Other Affiliate LSG Lufthansa Service Holding AG, Other Affiliate LSG Sky Chefs USA, Inc., Other Affiliate SC International Services, Inc. for Sky Chefs, Inc.. (Israel-Trummel, Kelsey) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ) filed bySky Chefs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Michelle Peak with Exhibits), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Franklin Bruce Murray with Exhibits), #3 Exhibit C (Declaration of David Potts with Exhibits), #4 Exhibit D (Declaration of Robert Mower with Exhibits))(Israel-Trummel, Kelsey) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Defendant's opposition is due by 6/21/2019. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10:00 a.m. on 6/24/2019. The hearing on #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 6/24/2019 at 2:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sky Chefs, Inc... (Israel-Trummel, Kelsey) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UNITE HERE International Union.. (Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sky Chefs, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by UNITE HERE International Union. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2019 09:00 AM before Judge ABC. Responses due by 6/21/2019. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Its Application, #2 Declaration of Kristin L. Martin with Exhibits A-B, #3 Declaration of Charles Hendricks with Exhibits A-G (Part 1), #4 Declaration of Charles Hendricks with Exhibits A-G (Part 2), #5 Declaration of Charles Hendricks with Exhibits A-G (Part 3), #6 Declaration of Charles Hendricks with Exhibits A-G (Part 4), #7 Declaration of David L. Barber with Exhibit A, #8 Declaration of Cesar Palancares with Exhibit A, #9 Declaration of Daniel Abraham, #10 Declaration of Leonid Volobrynskyy, #11 Declaration of Basiliza Vazquez, #12 Declaration of Dharon Golding with Exhibit A, #13 Declaration of Jake Rosner, #14 Declaration of Roberto Alvarez with Exhibit A, #15 Declaration of Marcely Bonilla, #16 Declaration of Dylan Daney, #17 Proposed Order)(Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by UNITE HERE International Union identifying Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 2, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 2850, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 1, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 7, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 8, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 11, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 17, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 23, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 24, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 26, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 30, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 57, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 100, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 226, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 274, Other Affiliate UNITE HERE Local 355 for UNITE HERE International Union. (Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sky Chefs, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13456771). Filed by UNITE HERE International Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITE HERE International Union v. Sky Chefs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Israel-Trummel
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE International Union
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Martin
Represented By: David Lorenzo Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?