Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas v. Pilkey
Plaintiff: Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas
Defendant: Daniel Pilkey
Case Number: 3:2019cv03620
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas re #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Chung, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas.. (Chung, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Daniel Pilkey. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jennifer K. Chung), (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13458716) filed by Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Brockett, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Brockett, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas (Brockett, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Brockett, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement against Defendant Daniel Pilkey, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13458572). Filed by Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brockett, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas v. Pilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Court of Master Sommeliers, Americas
Represented By: Jennifer Lorraine Brockett
Represented By: Jennifer K. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pilkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?