Admiral Insurance Company et al v. Landmark American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company, Admiral Insurance Company and Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv03661
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-7094 SI. *Document filed at Dkt. No. 20 was filed under an incorrect category. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/14/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASE TO 16-CV-7094. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/14/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/14/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Admiral Insurance Company.. (Elowsky, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Admiral Insurance Company (Elowsky, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd, Corporate Parent Endurance American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Endurance U.S. Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Sompo International Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc. for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Colony Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company.. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION [JOINT] TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Elowsky, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/30/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company. Landmark American Insurance Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Admiral Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Landmark American Insurance Company. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Colony Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Colony Insurance Company. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Elowsky (Elowsky, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Landmark American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13463333). Filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Charlston, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company et al v. Landmark American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Charlston
Represented By: Jennifer L. Elowsky,
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Charlston
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Represented By: Jennifer L. Elowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Charlston
Represented By: Jennifer L. Elowsky,
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?