The Clorox Company v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Clorox Company
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv03767
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by The Clorox Company (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Clorox Company (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Erica Ramsey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13604467.) filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, South Dakota)(Ramsey, Erica) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Factory Mutual Insurance Company.. (Johnson, Scott) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/12/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Johnson, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Johnson, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFactory Mutual Insurance Company. (Johnson, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Clorox Company.. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Refund Status re #3 Application for Refund: APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26IEKUJC by The Clorox Company. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 ) against Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Filed by The Clorox Company. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13476185.). Filed by The Clorox Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Clorox Company v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Represented By: Rebecca Ariel Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Gregory Johnson
Represented By: Erica A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?