Torres v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Mario Torres
Defendant: Wasco State Prison, Captain T. Selby, M. Creamer, Correctional Training Facility (CTF), R. Robinson, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, California Correctional Health Care Services and Dr. Grewal
Case Number: 3:2019cv03851
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Sever Under FRCP 21; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, M. Creamer, Grewal, R. Robinson, T. Selby. Responses due by 9/25/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and Sever, #2 Proposed Order)(Tartaglio, Anthony) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, M. Creamer, Grewal, R. Robinson, T. Selby.. (Tartaglio, Anthony) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION To Change The Time For Defendants To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, M. Creamer, Grewal, R. Robinson, T. Selby. (Tartaglio, Anthony) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of summons and complaint by United States Marshals Service. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Correctional Training Facility (CTF), M. Creamer, Grewal, R. Robinson, T. Selby, Wasco State Prison. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Mario Torres. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mario Torres. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (no process) against California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Correctional Training Facility (CTF), M. Creamer, R. Robinson, T. Selby, Wasco State Prison & Dr. Grewal, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 7/3/2019). Filed by Mario Torres. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain T. Selby
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Creamer
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Training Facility (CTF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Robinson
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Grewal
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?