Tini v. Monsanto Company

Case Number: 3:2019cv04013
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey (Camden), 1:19-cv-14212 RBK AMD, Tini v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04013 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-14212. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of California Northern. (dd, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kate Miller on 06/26/19, filed by DANIELLE TINI, NINO TINI. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
June 25, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9768627) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DANIELLE TINI, NINO TINI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tini v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?