Robbins v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Robbins
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv04014
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gwendolyn Robbins. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Enochs, John) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Mississippi (Southern), 1:19-cv-00338 LG RHW, Robbins v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04014 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Notified CM/ECF systems manager to electronically transfer case. (wld)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Vince Chhabria. (wld)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Remark: Copy of conditional transfer order (CTO-140) entered in MDL Case No. 2741, in re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation. (PKS)
June 24, 2019 Issued Summons mailed to attorney listed on summons/docket. (JCH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (JCH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (JCH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4019962), filed by Gwendolyn Robbins. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Robbins
Represented By: John C. Enochs
Represented By: John Christian Enochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?