Laughlin et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gayle L. Laughlin and Mark D. Laughlin
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv04016
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Minnesota (DMN), 0:19-cv-01657 ECT BRT, Laughlin v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04016 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 140 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01657. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-140) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (kt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark D. Laughlin, Gayle L. Laughlin. Monsanto Company served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Nemo, Anthony)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Re-Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KDS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KDS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1657 ECT/BRT. (KDS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6958209) filed by Mark D Laughlin, Gayle L Laughlin. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nemo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laughlin et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle L. Laughlin
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Represented By: Anthony J Nemo, Sr
Represented By: Andrew L Davick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Laughlin
Represented By: Ashleigh Raso
Represented By: Anthony J Nemo, Sr
Represented By: Andrew L Davick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?