Love v. Angelopoulos et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Love
Defendant: Thomas N. Predovich, Polly Angelopoulos and Andreas Angelopoulos
Case Number: 3:2019cv04034
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Samuel Love. Service waived by Thomas N. Predovich waiver sent on 8/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Samuel Love of withdrawal of Proof of Service for Defendant Thomas N. Predovich (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Love. Thomas N. Predovich served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Love. Andreas Angelopoulos served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Love. Polly Angelopoulos served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andreas Angelopoulos, Polly Angelopoulos, Thomas N. Predovich. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 6/17). Please complete correct Civ il Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 07-19) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Re: #1 .1] Complaint, filed by Samuel Love (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2019)
July 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/14/2019)
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel Love re #1 Complaint, (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/14/2019)
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13517273.). Filed bySamuel Love. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Angelopoulos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Predovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Angelopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Angelopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Love
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?