Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. v. The Mark Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Residential Realty Advisors, Inc.
Defendant: The Mark Company, Inc. and Pacific Union International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04042
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc... (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pacific Union International, Inc. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc.. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/25/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Residential Realty Advisors, Inc... (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Civil Cover Sheet on Defendant Pacific Union International, Inc. (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Civil Cover Sheet on Defendant The Mark Company, Inc. (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. . (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pacific Union International, Inc., The Mark Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13519261.). Filed byResidential Realty Advisors, Inc.. (Jacobs, Ethan) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Residential Realty Advisors, Inc. v. The Mark Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mark Company, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Union International, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residential Realty Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?