Optima Direct, LLC v. No NDA Inc.
Plaintiff: Optima Direct, LLC
Defendant: No NDA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04048
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or to Otherwise Respond to Complaint - Motion Unopposed - filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint to September 8, 2019 filed by Optima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to September 8, 2019)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optima Direct, LLC. No NDA Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to No NDA Inc.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Optima Direct, LLC re 19-cv-4041 & 4045 filed on July 15, 2019 (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Optima Direct, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Red Dragon Innovations, LLC, Other Affiliate 2s Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate ALY Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Rabicoff Law LLC for Optima Direct, LLC. re #1 Complaint (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Optima Direct, LLC re 3:19-cv- 4041 & 4045 Related Cases. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against No NDA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13519563.). Filed byOptima Direct, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optima Direct, LLC v. No NDA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Direct, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anton Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No NDA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?