State of Alabama et al v. Endo International PLC, et al
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas, State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Florida, State of Illinois, State of Washington, State of Ohio, State of Missouri, State of Alabama, State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Hawaii, State of Wisconsin, State of Mississippi, State of Oklahoma, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Utah and State of Indiana
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceutical Inc., Endo international PLC. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04157
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE. This case is found to be related to Case No. 14-md-2521-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/21/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo international PLC. of Filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related in MDL No. 14-md-02521-WHO (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY RELIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to Gener Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo international PLC... (Gordon, George) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of Utah.. (Geary, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction filed by State of Utah. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Geary, Stephen) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Endo Pharmaceutical Inc., Endo international PLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13535320.). Filed by State of Missouri, State of Iowa, State of Arkansas, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Wisconsin, State of Ohio, State of Illinois, State of Florida, State of Minnesota, State of Oklahoma, State of Washington, State of Indiana, State of Utah, State of Maryland, State of Hawaii, State of Mississippi, State of Idaho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Geary, Stephen) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alabama et al v. Endo International PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Johnathan R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Joseph C. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Gary Honick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Lee Istrail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Angelina Maria Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Justin Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Sara E. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Michael Schwalbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Billington M. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: John K. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Max M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Rodney I. Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Laura E. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Crystal Utley Secoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Caleb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Sarah Oxenham Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Stephen Wendell Geary
Represented By: Tara Pincock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana
Represented By: Amanda Jane Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo international PLC.
Represented By: George G. Gordon
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: George G. Gordon
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?