Park Miller, LLC et al v. Durham Group, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Lawson, James Combs, Dorothy Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Suzanne B. Combs, Park Miller, LLC, Henry S Lawson, Edward Miner and Gregory M. Combs
Defendant: Craig McGrain, First Austin Funding Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., Maasai Holdings LLC and Durham Commercial Capital Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04185
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by June D. Coleman (Coleman, June) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner re #1 Complaint, , WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. Service waived by Craig McGrain waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson.. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13538318). Filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Miller, LLC et al v. Durham Group, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Lawson
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Combs
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Combs
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawson Land, Inc.
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne B. Combs
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Miller, LLC
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry S Lawson
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Miner
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Combs
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Represented By: Alexandrea Marie Tomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig McGrain
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Austin Funding Corp.
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham Group, Ltd.
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maasai Holdings LLC
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham Commercial Capital Corp.
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?