Proofpoint, Inc. et al v. Vade Secure, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cloudmark LLC and Proofpoint, Inc.
Defendant: Vade Secure, Incorporated, Olivier Lemarie and Vade Secure SASU
Case Number: 3:2019cv04238
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Olivier Lemarie, Vade Secure SASU, Vade Secure, Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Vade Secure, Incorporated, Vade Secure SASU, and Olivier Lemarie's Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Olivier Lemarie (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vade Secure SASU (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vade Secure SASU identifying Corporate Parent LLG Capital for Vade Secure SASU. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vade Secure, Incorporated (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vade Secure, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Vade Secure SASU for Vade Secure, Incorporated. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #23 Order on Stipulation, Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants' time to file responsive pleadings to plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including September 16, 2019. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from October 25, 2019, to November 8, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Olivier Lemarie, Vade Secure SASU, Vade Secure, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin H. Murray in Support of Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint)(Murray, Colin) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. Vade Secure SASU served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Affidavit of Service of French huissier de justice) (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order, service on Defendant Olivier Lemarie (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. re #15 Case Management Scheduling Order, service on Defendant Vade Secure, Incorporated (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. Olivier Lemarie served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. Vade Secure, Incorporated served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 07/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Olivier Lemarie, Vade Secure SASU, Vade Secure, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jodie W. Cheng As Counsel for Plaintiffs (Cheng, Jodie) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc... (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Iman Lordgooei as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Proofpoint, Inc. and Cloudmark LLC (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13546693.). Filed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proofpoint, Inc. et al v. Vade Secure, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloudmark LLC
Represented By: Iman Lordgooei
Represented By: Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Represented By: Jodie W. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proofpoint, Inc.
Represented By: Iman Lordgooei
Represented By: Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Represented By: Jodie W. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vade Secure, Incorporated
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivier Lemarie
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vade Secure SASU
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?