Kolakowski v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Kolakowski
Defendant: LITHIA OF SANTA ROSA, INC. d/b/a LITHIA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE OF SANTA ROSA, FCA US LLC and Lithia of Santa Rosa, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04260
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR OCTOBER 25, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO COUNSEL. All counsel shall appear telephonically at the October 25, 2019 Case Management Conference at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST TO APPEAR AT CMC TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANDRA KOLAKOWSKI'S COUNSEL. (Lim, Jeeho) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FCA US LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. The Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC.. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -page 26) by Lithia of Santa Rosa, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by FCA US LLC (Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action re Federal Question; Demand for Jury Trial from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-264670. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13550771). Filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin E. Hanson in support of Removal of Civil Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hanson, Erin) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolakowski v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kolakowski
Represented By: Jeeho H. Lim
Represented By: Christopher Michael Lovasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITHIA OF SANTA ROSA, INC. d/b/a LITHIA CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE OF SANTA ROSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: Georges A. Haddad
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia of Santa Rosa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?