Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2019cv04533
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco.. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco Proof of Service (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2019. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet to the Complaint #1 by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco . (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/5/2019)(Linked) Modified on 8/5/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 #Electronic Filing Error Incorrect Revision of the Civil Cover Sheet - Current Revision is JS-CAND44 (Rev. 07/19). This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Offi ce and no judge assignment will be made until this document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet and LINK it to the complaint. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Justice > Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13578012.). Filed by Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment: See Corrected Civil Cover Sheet as dkt. #3 :) (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/2/2019) (Linked) Modified on 8/5/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/6/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Weissman Ward
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?