Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC v. 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Defendant: 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04617
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT. (Related documents(s) #11 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default Plaintiff Wells Fargo Commerical Distribution Finance, LLC's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant 6th Gear Holdings, Inc. filed by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Farah Tabibkhoei In Support of Plaintiff Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.; Certificate of Service)(Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC re #9 Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Injunctive Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, Proposed Order for Writ of Possession, Declaration of Alex P. Franch (Exhibit A) (Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Application for Writ by Farah Tabibkhoei (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Writ of Possession and Injunctive Relief)(Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons (Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC.. (Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13596809.). Filed byWells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Declaration)(Tabibkhoei, Farah) (Filed on 8/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC v. 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Jonathan Rath Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6th Gear Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?