Rico v. Ducart et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Andrade Rico
Defendant: Jim Robertson, Sergeant B Ramsey, Associate Warden G. W. Olson, Taylor Melton, Clark E. Ducart, Chief Deputy Warden D Bradbury, Chief Deputy Warden D. Bradbury and Sergeant B. Ramsey
Case Number: 3:2019cv04713
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Case transferred to the Eastern District of California via ECF. New case number - 2:19-cv-01989. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2019. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Rico's Second, Third, And Fourth Claims Only by Jorge Andrade Rico (Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by D. Bradbury, Clark E. Ducart, Taylor Melton, G. W. Olson, B. Ramsey, Jim Robertson -- Notice of Hearing on #11 Pending Motion to Dismiss (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/23/2019) Modified on 9/24/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by D. Bradbury, Clark E. Ducart, Taylor Melton, G. W. Olson, B. Ramsey, Jim Robertson. Responses due by 10/2/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Action, #2 Defs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to K to Defs' RJN in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jorge Andrade Rico. Service waived by All Defendants. (Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jorge Andrade Rico.. (Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to D. Bradbury, Clark E. Ducart, Taylor Melton, G. W. Olson, B. Ramsey, Jim Robertson. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by Jorge Andrade Rico Attorney In formation is Incomplete. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 8/20/19 Proposed Summons. (Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/21/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference: Notice is given that an Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13604943.). Filed byJorge Andrade Rico. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falkenstien, Kate) (Filed on 8/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rico v. Ducart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Robertson
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant B Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden G. W. Olson
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Melton
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark E. Ducart
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Warden D Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Warden D. Bradbury
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant B. Ramsey
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Andrade Rico
Represented By: Kate Martin Falkenstien
Represented By: Shawna Lee Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?