Walnum v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Walnum
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., Hutchinson Technology Inc., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., Headway Technologies, Inc., NHK International Corporation and NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Petitioner: Apex Computers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv04738
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(b) filed by James Walnum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Miriam R. Vishio is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff James Walnum. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 4, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by James Walnum of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ACCEPTING SERVICE. The stipulation filed September 11, 2019, is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ACCEPTING SERVICE. The stipulation filed September 9, 2019, is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service filed by James Walnum. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER. Apex Computers, Inc. v. Headway Technologies, Inc, et al., Case No. 19-5507, is related to Walnum v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 4738, Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 19-4828, and Glover v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 19-5268. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Accepting Service filed by James Walnum. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Walnum. NHK International Corporation served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Walnum. Hutchinson Technology Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Walnum. Headway Technologies, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 19-4738 MMC, Walnum v Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., is related to Case No. 19-4828, Kawahara v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al., and Case No. 19-5268, Glover v. Headway Technologies, Inc., et al. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Apex Computers, Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(b) filed by James Walnum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 1at 0:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Walnum.. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13606834.). Filed byJames Walnum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 8/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walnum v. Headway Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (H.K.) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headway Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walnum
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Micheletti
Represented By: Qianwei Fu
Represented By: James Robertson Martin
Represented By: Miriam R Vishio
Represented By: Judith A. Zahid
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Apex Computers, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?