In re PG&E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Defendant: Trina Grant
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Not Classified By Court: Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, GER Hospitality, LLC, Ashley Vinson Crawford, Kevin Burnett, Individual Fire Victim Creditors, Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, SLF Fire Victim Claimants, Richard W. Carpeneti, Sonoma Clean Power Authority, Mark Bowman, et al., Adventist Health System/West, Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River, Feather River Hospital, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Paradise Unified School District, Napa Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Sara Shepherd, Michael Heinstein, Sonoma Courts Shops, Inc., William O'Brien, Karen Roberds, Rita Godward, Allen Goldberg, Anita Freeman, Butte County Mosquito and Vector Control District, Melissa Redmond, Stan Rickaby, Kye Heinstein, Fuguan O'Brien, Clinton Reilly, Jon Shepherd, Northern Holdings, LLC, William Ferrence, Kenneth Born, Patricia Goodberg, Terrence Redmond, AT&T Corp., Paradise Irrigation District, William Steel, Napa County Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Christine Born, Cathy Ferrence, Paul Goodberg, Ming O'Brien and Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River
Debtor In Possession: Pacific Gas and Electric Company and PG&E Corporation
Interested Party: Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, Public Advocates Office at the California Public Utilities Commission, The Baupost Group, L.L.C., California State Agencies, PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), PAUL J. PASCUZZI, PG&E Shareholders, United States of America and People of the State of California
Claimant: Karen Gowins and William B. Abrams
Case Number: 3:2019cv05257
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER TERMINATING ESTIMATION PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/9/2020. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 6, 2020 Filing 386 Letter from Jeremiah Hallisey and Francis O. Scarpulla re Motion to Establish . (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 6/6/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Allan Peluso CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 384 (Peluso, Larry) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Allan Peluso (Peluso, Larry) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 30, 2020 Filing 383 Joint Response of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to the Statement of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and the Objection of Certain Fire Victims re #380 Opposition/Response to Motion, #381 Statement by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/30/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 382 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5-21-2020 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Stone, Alan) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 381 Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding #378 Statement, Joint Statement of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Tort Claimants in Response to the Court's May 21, 2020 Request by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Bray, Gregory) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 380 SECOND Supplemental Objections (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases) filed by Karen Roberds. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Filing 379 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases ) Letter filed byKaren Roberds. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 378 Statement re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases Joint Statement of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Tort Claimants in Response to the Court's May 21, 2020 Request by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 377 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2020. Total Time in Court: 55 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/26/2020 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Filing 376 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/21/20, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #365 Transcript Order, #370 Transcript Order, #375 Transcript Order, #374 Transcript Order, #372 Transcript Order, #373 Transcript Order, #371 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2020. (Related documents(s) #365 , #370 , #375 , #374 , #372 , #373 , #371 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Judge James Donato by Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Winthrop, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 374 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 21, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (McCallen, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 373 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Judge James Donato by GER Hospitality, LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 21, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 371 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 21, 2020 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 369 OBJECTIONS to re #367 Statement, Objection of The Adventist Claimants to Debtors Statement Pursuant To 11 U.SC. 105(A) And 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases by Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River. (Winthrop, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 368 OBJECTIONS to re #367 Statement, Concerning Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(A) and 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases and the Attached [Proposed] Order by Napa County Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Napa Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Northern Holdings, LLC, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Paradise Irrigation District, Paradise Unified School District. (Weiss, David) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 367 Statement re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Order (with Exhibit))(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 366 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases) filed by Karen Roberds. (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER. The motion hearing set for May 21, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. For the hearing, the parties should advise the Court by 2:00 p.m. California time on Wednesday, May 20, 2020, what, if any, contingent or unliquidated claims remain to be estimated in these proceedings. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 20, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by ema il prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/81346862039?pwd=MEkzRzJBeDU4eFVvMXdBNWxFaUZGUT09 Webinar ID: 813 4686 2039 Password: 717771 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13017158592,,81346862039# or +13126266799,,81346862039# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 International numbers available: #https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kbGW0aQI23 PLEA SE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for i nformation on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 363 Joinder by Approximately 27,300 Fire Victim Claimants to Debtors' Statement Concerning Status Conference re 308 Order, #360 Case Management Statement by SLF Fire Victim Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marshack, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER. The majority of the parties have advised the Court that a status conference is not needed at this time. No party has identified an issue that might require a conference. Consequently, the status conference set for May 18, 2020, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 361 Statement Debtors' Statement Concerning Plan Voting Results by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 17, 2020 Filing 360 Debtors' Statement Concerning the May 18, 2020 Status Conference filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 5/17/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 359 Joinder in #357 Supplemental Status Conference Statement Re Estimation Trial filed by Karen Gowins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kane, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 358 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/18/2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 357 Supplemental Status Conference Statement Re Estimation Trial by GER Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/14/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER. The status conference set for May 18, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by May 15, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom li nk, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. The parties are reminded that the case before the Court is limited to estimation. The parties may advise the Court if the conference is not necessary by May 17, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., California time. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/84200660663?pwd=SjB0R09SRk03a29xNDVWcDRPWFFrUT09 Webinar ID: 842 0066 0663 Password: 493823 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13017158592,,84200660663# or +13126266799,,84200660663# br> Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 International numbers available: #https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kcY0Xak4fl PL EASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance and Service of Papers as Pro Se Claimant William B. Abrams. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 354 OBJECTIONS to #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases by William B. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 353 Letter from Kevin J. Orsini Responding to Letters Regarding Canceled April 30 Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 352 Letter from Jeremiah F Hallisey re: Cancellation of the April 30, 2020 Status Conference. (Hallisey, Jeremiah) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER. Most of the parties have proposed to cancel the April 30, 2020, status conference, and no party has identified anything for discussion. Consequently, the status conference is vacated. The next conference is set for May 18, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., California time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/29/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 350 Statement / Official Committee of Tort Claimants' Statement Regarding April 30, 2020 Status Conference by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 349 Joinder re #342 Statement, Status Conference Statement of Many Fire Victims Re Voting Procedure Irregularities by Karen Gowins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kane, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 348 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Debtors' Statement Concerning the April 30, 2020 Status Conference filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 347 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SLF Fire Victim Claimants re #345 Status Report, (Singleton, Gerald) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 346 Joinder In Response of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Debtors' Motion to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes by Karen Gowins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kane, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/28/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2020 Filing 345 Joint Status Report Regarding Status of the Vote by SLF Fire Victim Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikal Watts, #2 Declaration of Gerald Singleton, #3 Declaration of Richard Bridgford, #4 Declaration of Bill Robins, #5 Declaration of James P. Frantz)(Singleton, Gerald) (Filed on 4/28/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 344 Statement Status Conference by Christine Born, Kenneth Born, Richard W. Carpeneti, Cathy Ferrence, William Ferrence, Anita Freeman, GER Hospitality, LLC, Rita Godward, Allen Goldberg, Patricia Goodberg, Paul Goodberg, Kye Heinstein, Michael Heinstein, Fuguan O'Brien, Ming O'Brien, William O'Brien, Melissa Redmond, Terrence Redmond, Clinton Reilly, Karen Roberds, Sonoma Courts Shops, Inc.. (Hallisey, Jeremiah) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Ellen Kane (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kane, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 342 Status Conference Statement of Many Fire Victims Re Voting Procedure Irregularities by Individual Fire Victim Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Tosdal, Thomas) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 341 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/30/2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 340 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Joinder OF CERTAIN FIRE VICTIMS IN WILLIAM B. ABRAMS MOTION TO DESIGNATE IMPROPERLY SOLICITED VOTES PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 1125(B) AND 1126(E) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 2019 by Christine Born, Kenneth Born, Cathy Ferrence, William Ferrence, Anita Freeman, GER Hospitality, LLC, Rita Godward, Allen Goldberg, Patricia Goodberg, Paul Goodberg, Kye Heinstein, Michael Heinstein, Fuguan O'Brien, Ming O'Brien, William O'Brien, Melissa Redmond, Terrence Redmond, Clinton Reilly, Karen Roberds, Sonoma Courts Shops, Inc., William Steel. (Hallisey, Jeremiah) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER. The status conference set for April 30, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 29, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., California time. The parties may advise the Court if the conference is not necessary by the same deadline. Email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: # https://zoom.us/j/97683147832?pwd=MnZqb1JQVHZEdXdmdHNGZGE4R3hlZz09 Webinar ID: 976-8314-7832 Password: 379160Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13126266799,,97683147832# or +13462487799,,97683147832# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 International numbers available: # https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/24/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER. CAL FIRE's discovery letter brief, Dkt. No. #260 , is terminated without prejudice as moot in light of the proposed settlement. The State's related motion to seal, Dkt. No. #261 , is also terminated. The Court is advised that PG&E has announced a plea agreement to resolve the then-ongoing criminal investigation that the State argued justified sealing. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/23/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/16/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by SLF Fire Victim Claimants, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Singleton, Gerald) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 333 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/16/20, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #319 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Related documents(s) #319 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Napa County Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Napa Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Northern Holdings, LLC, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Paradise Irrigation District, Paradise Unified School District, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Weiss, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 331 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David A. Rosenzweig ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14381233.) filed by Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Winthrop, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 330 Statement re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases, #311 Reply to Opposition/Response, Statement of Recent Decision by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 329 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mikal C. Watts (Filing fee $ 310.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/14/2020 filed by Individual Fire Victim Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Nicole Boldt (Boldt, Paige) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #318 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mikal C. Watts. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 326 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Walter Jackson Quentin L. Kopp and Daniel S. Mason (Jackson, Thomas) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 324 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 16, 2020 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 322 Joinder of Numerous Fire Claimants to the Official Committee of Tort Claimants' Response to Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. sections 105(A) and 502 (C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes Of the Chapter 11 Cases by Trina Grant. (Kunkle, Brendan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Green and Brendan Kunkle (Green, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Matthew Kunkle and Michael D. Green (Kunkle, Brendan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/16/2020 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 318 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mikal C. Watts ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14371640.) filed by Individual Fire Victim Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Watts, Mikal) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 The status conference hearing set for April 16, 2020, will be held by Zoom Webinar at 2:00 p.m., California time. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to participate at the hearing by emailing a name and email address to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 14, 2020, at 5:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link. Participating counsel will call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Members of the press and public may attend the webinar as non-participating attendees at the following link: # https://zoom.us/j/97320491934?pwd=aDBGVE5xdlVwZmlhaTZxRFQ0WkYyUT09 Webinar ID: 973 2049 1934 Password: 230317 Or iPhone one-tap : US: 12532 158782,,97320491934# or +13017158592,,97320491934# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/ 13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 316 Joinder re #295 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 308 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Kevin Burnett. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 315 Joinder of Lead and Liaison Counsel in California JCCP Proceedings to the TCC's Response to Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(A) and 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases filed by Jon Shepherd, Sara Shepherd. (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 4/13/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2020 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Elizabeth Cordova of Frank M. Pitre and Alison E. Cordova (Cordova, Alison) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Khaldoun A. Baghdadi Notice of Appearance of Michael A. Kelly and Khaldoun A. Baghdadi (Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 11, 2020 Filing 312 Joinder by Approximately 25,000 Fire Victim Claimants to Debtors Statement Concerning Status Conference re 308 Order, #311 Reply to Opposition/Response by SLF Fire Victim Claimants. (Singleton, Gerald) (Filed on 4/11/2020) Modified on 4/13/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2020 Filing 311 REPLY (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases ) filed byPG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Debtors' Letter Response, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of April 7, 2020 Hearing)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 310 REPLY (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases ) to the Response of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants filed byAd Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin P. McCallen, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Benjamin P. McCallen, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Benjamin P. McCallen, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Benjamin P. McCallen)(Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 309 Statement re #295 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Statement Regarding Response of Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Debtors' Motion to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Bray, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 16, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., California time. The status conference will be held on the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 307 Declaration of Eric Lowrey in Support of Objection by Certain Fire Victims to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(A) and 502(C) to Establish Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases #306 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Richard W. Carpeneti, Anita Freeman, GER Hospitality, LLC, Kye Heinstein, Michael Heinstein, Fuguan O'Brien, Ming O'Brien, William O'Brien, Clinton Reilly, Karen Roberds, William Steel. (Related document(s) #306 ) (Hallisey, Jeremiah) (Filed on 4/3/2020) Modified on 4/6/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2020 Filing 306 OBJECTION (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases) filed by Karen Roberds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla)(Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2020) Modified on 4/6/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2020 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Lapping (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 304 Joinder re #302 Reply to Opposition/Response, Correct Joinder by Butte County Mosquito and Vector Control District. (Soares, Manuel) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 303 OBJECTIONS to re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases Objection of the Adventist Claimants and Joinder to Objection of Paradise Irrigation District, et al. to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases by Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River. (Winthrop, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 302 JOINDER in Objection (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases) filed by Butte County Mosquito and Vector Control District. (Soares, Manuel) (Filed on 4/3/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2020 Filing 301 OBJECTIONS to re #299 Objection, #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases and Joinder in Opposition of Paradise Irrigation District et al. by AT&T Corp.. (Koegel, Thomas) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 300 Statement re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases - Statement and Reservation of Rights of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(A) and 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of The Chapter 11 Cases by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Bray, Gregory) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 299 OBJECTIONS to re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases by Paradise Irrigation District, Paradise Unified School District, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Northern Holdings, LLC, Napa County Recycling and Waste Services, LLC, Napa Recycling and Waste Services, LLC. (Weiss, David) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 298 Statement re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases Reservation of Rights by United States of America. (Troy, Matthew) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 297 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases ) California State Agencies' Reservation of Rights on Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases filed byCalifornia State Agencies. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 296 Declaration of David J. Richardson in Support of #295 Opposition/Response to Motion,, / Declaration of David J. Richardson in Support of Response of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Debtors Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(A) and 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases filed byCreditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #295 ) (Richardson, David) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 295 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases ) Response of the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Debtors Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(A) And 502(C) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases filed byCreditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Julian, Robert) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #292 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gerardo Mijares-Shafai. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #291 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Mintz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 292 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14326366.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/30/2020 filed by AT&T Corp.. (Mijares-Shafai, Gerardo) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 291 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14332145.) filed by AT&T Corp.. (Mintz, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Francis Koegel (Appearance of Crowell & Moring LLP for Claimant AT&T Corp.) (Koegel, Thomas) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah F. Hallisey (Hallisey, Jeremiah) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #287 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gerardo Mijares-Shafai. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gerardo Mijares-Shafai (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-14326366.) filed by AT&T Corp.. (Mijares-Shafai, Gerardo) (Filed on 3/30/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2020 Filing 286 Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 502(c) to Establish Estimated Amount of Fire Victim Claims for All Purposes of the Chapter 11 Cases filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/3/2020. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 3/20/2020) Modified on 3/23/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2020 Filing 285 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Scott Tye (Tye, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 282 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019; 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Case Stayed (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #275 , the February 18, 2020 estimation hearing and all pre-hearing dates are vacated. The case is stayed pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/20/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 275 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Stay the Estimation Proceedings filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 273 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 12/17/2019. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 17, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 271 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-17-2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #268 Transcript Order, #269 Transcript Order, #270 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (Related documents(s) #268 , #269 , #270 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 270 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/17/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #263 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kody D.L. Kleber. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 266 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Alan Julian, Esq / Notice of Change of Address for Baker & Hostetler, LLP (San Francisco, California) (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Video Camera hearing set for 12/17/2019 01:00 PM. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER. In light of the settlement motion, the case is stayed pending further order of the Court. The next status conference is reset for December 17, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/9/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 8, 2019 Filing 264 Letter from the Official Committee of Tort Claimants, the Debtors and the Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claimants . (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 263 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Kody D.L. Kleber ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13956815.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Kleber, Kody) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 262 Discovery Letter Brief to the Honorable James Donato [Dkt. No. 261] filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Video Camera hearing set for 12/16/2019 02:00 PM. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief re Redaction)(Fogg, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 260 Discovery Letter BriefCal Fire Letter re Camp Fire Evidence filed by California State Agencies. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 2, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato by Individual Fire Victim Creditors, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/2/19 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #248 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David William Rice. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Frantz (Frantz, James) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 2, 2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 250 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 2, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #249 Transcript Order, #246 Transcript Order, #245 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2020. (Related documents(s) #249 , #246 , #245 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato by Public Advocates Office at the California Public Utilities Commission, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lacey, Alisa) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David William Rice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13939084.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Rice, David) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, the stipulation re fire victim testimony is entered. Dkt. No. #239 . Fire victim testimony may not be used for any purpose other than these estimation proceedings. Discovery requests are not objectionable because they were based on information obtained from such testimony. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/2/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 1, 2019 Filing 245 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/02/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 12/1/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 244 Discovery Letter Brief Re: Letter from Ad Hoc Subrogation Group filed by California State Agencies. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE by Adventist Health System/West, Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River Notice of Filing of the Adventist Claimants' Objection to the Debtors' Notice of Designation of Claims Filed by the United States of America, the State of California and Adventist Health System as Unliquidated and Subject to Estimation Under Section 502(c) of the Bankruptcy Code [DE #4553] (Winthrop, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders re #241 Letter (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 241 Letter from the Ad Hoc Subrogation Group . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing of Opposition of the United States of America to Notice of Debtors' Designation of Claims Filed by the United States of America, the State of California, and Advenist Health System as Unliquidated and Subject to Estimation Under Section 502(c) of the Bankruptcy Code (Pham, Danielle) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 239 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Parties Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Testimony Elicited from and Documents Produced by Fire Victims filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE by California State Agencies Notice of Filing Response of the California State Agencies to Debtors' Notice of Designation of Claims filed by the State of California as Unliquidated and Subject to Estimation Under Section 502(c) of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 4553] (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #236 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Zaken. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 236 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Zaken ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13925274.) filed by Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 235 STIPULATION ("Joint Stipulation for the Production of Supplemental Custodial ESI") filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Orsini, Kevin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Video Camera hearing set for 12/2/2019 02:00 PM. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER RE CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/21/2019. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 227 Statement Regarding Consent to Cameras in the Courtroom Project by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 226 Statement Regarding Consent to Cameras in the Courtroom Project by PG&E Corporation. (Kim, Jane) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 18, 2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants Notice of Agreement to Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #179 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Danyll W. Foix. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #182 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas E. Hogan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #180 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dustin M. Dow. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #177 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charles D. Cording. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #202 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Terry M. Brennan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating #199 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Kavouras; granting #201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Kavouras. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #200 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margot Mooney. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #198 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Victoria A. Sheets. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #193 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Caleb Robertson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alex Weiss. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #191 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Grant S. May. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #190 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Evan M. Norris. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #189 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthias Thompson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #188 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa Valladares. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #187 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah V. Warburg-Johnson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #186 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Beshara. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/19 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER RE EXCHANGING EXPERT WORK PRODUCT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/19/2019. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 232 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 11/18/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on Novermber 18, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 203 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 18, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #196 Transcript Order, #185 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. (Related documents(s) #196 , #185 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 202 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Terry M. Brennan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13900641.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brennan, Terry) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 201 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Daniel M. Kavouras ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13899947.) Filing fee previously paid on November 18, 2019 filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kavouras, Daniel) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Margot G. Mooney ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13900080.) filed by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Mooney, Margot) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Daniel M. Kavouras ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13899947.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kavouras, Daniel) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 198 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria A. Sheets ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13899874.) filed by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Sheets, Victoria) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 197 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato by Individual Fire Victim Creditors, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 195 Discovery Letter Brief to the Honorable James Donato filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 194 Discovery Letter Brief filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Requests for Production)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Caleb J. Robertson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13896104.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Alex B. Weiss ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13896094.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Grant S. May ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13896069.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 190 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Evan M. Norris ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13896041.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Matthias S. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13895985.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 188 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Melissa A. Valladares ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13895916.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Sarah Virginia Warburg-Johnson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13895871.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 186 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Beshara ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13895767.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants Notice of Entry of Order Extending Bar Date for Fire Claimants and Appointing Claims Representative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Julian, Robert) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Thomas Cutts (Cutts, Kyle) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Thomas E. Hogan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13887235.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hogan, Thomas) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 181 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Exchanging Work Product Prepared By Expert Consultants filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Dustin M. Dow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13886162.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/13/2019 filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dow, Dustin) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 179 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Danyll W. Foix ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13885805.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Foix, Danyll) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Springer McCabe (McCabe, Bridget) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 177 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Cording ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13885572.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/13/2019 filed by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Cording, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by David John Richardson (Richardson, David) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 11, 2019 Filing 175 STIPULATION Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 11/11/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by The Baupost Group, L.L.C., for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Lauter, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by Public Advocates Office at the California Public Utilities Commission, for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Lacey, Alisa) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 171 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/4/2019, before Judge James Donato. Certified Shorthand Reporter, Kelly Shainline, telephone number (510) 828-9404; Email: info@brycereporters.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Certified Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #163 Transcript Order, #164 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2020. (Related documents(s) #163 , #164 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 4, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by Individual Fire Victim Creditors, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 4, 2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/4/19 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 11/4/2019. Status Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Kelly Bryce Shainline. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 2, 2019 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 11/2/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 162 Letter from Kevin J. Orsini to the Honorable James Donato. (Orsini, Kevin) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #156 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brittany L. Sukiennik. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 159 Letter from the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to the Honorable James Donato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/19 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Lauter, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/19 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Lauter, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brittany L. Sukiennik ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13840487.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 155 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2019, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #135 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2020. (Related documents(s) #135 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato by Individual Fire Victim Creditors, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato by The Baupost Group, L.L.C., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - CJA for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Bryson, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 28, 2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 10/28/2019. Status Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 32 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 28, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 27, 2019 Filing 138 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT in Advance of October 28, 2019 Status Conference on Estimation filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 10/27/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack Murphy. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. The TCC's #130 unopposed request that PG&E be directed to produce the San Bruno settlement documents, without redaction, pursuant to the protective order in this case and under the "professional eyes-only" designation is granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/24/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 133 Statement of Debtors regarding Claims Noticing Procedures by PG&E Corporation. (Kim, Jane) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13816900.) filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Murphy, John) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants Notice of Filing Motion for Extension of Bar Date and Supporting Declarations by the Official Committee of Tort Claimants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Julian, Robert) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 130 Letter from the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to the Honorable James Donato. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato by Public Advocates Office at the California Public Utilities Commission, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Lacey, Alisa) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 128 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/21/19, before Judge James J. Donato. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #119 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Related documents(s) #119 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 21, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 10/21/2019. Status Conference set for 10/28/2019 01:00 PM before Judge James Donato. Total Time in Court: 47 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Darin Patrick McAtee. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joe Wesley Earnhardt. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Darin Patrick McAtee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13798374.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joe Wesley Earnhardt ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13798332.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Kyle Feist (Feist, Joseph) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/11/2019. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Estimation Hearing set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/19/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/20/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/21/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/25/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 2/28/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Estimation Hearing set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER NO. 1 RE ESTIMATION PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/9/2019. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 111 Statement Parties' Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Julian, Robert) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/7/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 107 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/7/19, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #98 Transcript Order, #101 Transcript Order, #105 Transcript Order, #88 Transcript Order, #96 Transcript Order, #95 Transcript Order, #97 Transcript Order, #99 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2020. (Related documents(s) #98 , #101 , #105 , #88 , #96 , #95 , #97 , #99 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #104 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Freimuth. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Freimuth ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13775665.) filed by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Freimuth, Matthew) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Morgan R. Hirst. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Shareholders, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 7, 2019 before Judge James Donato by California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/7/19 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lauter, Michael) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 7, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 10/7/2019. Status Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato.Total Time in Court: 1 hour & 21 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Morgan R. Hirst ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13762019.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/03/2019 filed by PG&E Shareholders. (Johnston, James) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by James Olin Johnston , Bruce S. Bennett and Joshua M. Mester on behalf of PG&E Shareholders (Johnston, James) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter T. Barbur. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Morgan R. Hirst. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Freimuth. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. The parties should be prepared to discuss any outstanding discovery matters at the status conference on October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/07/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 87 Letter from Official Committee of Tort Claimants to the Honorable James Donato. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Morgan R. Hirst ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13762019.) filed by PG&E Shareholders. (Hirst, Morgan) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Peter T. Barbur ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13762024.) filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Benvenutti, Peter) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 84 RESPONSE re #81 Amended Document, by SLF Fire Victim Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marshack, Richard) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13759202.) filed by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders. (Freimuth, Matthew) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. The status conference previously set for October 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for October 7, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/1/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 81 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PG&E Corporation. Amendment to #80 Joint Case Management Statement of Parties in Advance of October 7, 2019 Status Conference on Estimation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kim, Jane) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT of Parties in Advance of October 7, 2019 Status Conference on Estimation filed by PG&E Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kim, Jane) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 79 Brief Camp Fire Claimants' Brief Re Estimation filed byIndividual Fire Victim Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tosdal, Thomas) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philippe Adler. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jason C. Rubinstein. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory J. Commins, Jr.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael S. Palmieri. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Seiler. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. The Court finds that summaries of settlement data from the 2010 San Bruno fire as outlined in Dkt. No. 52 could be useful in the estimation. The parties are directed to prepare a joint agreement on the specific content and format of the summaries. Any areas of disagreement will be taken up at the hearing on October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/20/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by SLF Fire Victim Claimants, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Masud, Laila) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Lee Tosdal (Tosdal, Tom) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 70 Discovery Letter Brief to the Honorable James Donato filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Gregory J. Commins, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13716374.) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Commins, Gregory) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. The Court declines to reinstate a stay of the Tubbs fire litigation. That case will proceed as scheduled in the California superior court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT ON TUBBS FIRE CLAIMANTS WHO RECEIVED RELIEF FROM STAY by Individual Fire Victim Creditors. (Riddle, Amanda) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. In light of the filing of the discovery letter on September 11, 2019, by the Tort Claimants, Dkt. No. 52, the Court directs PG&E to file a response by 10:00 am California time on September 19, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by GER Hospitality, LLC, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 9/10/2019.Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party), for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Lauter, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 10, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Behrens, James) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696865.) filed by The Baupost Group, L.L.C.. (Adler, Philippe) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696786.) filed by The Baupost Group, L.L.C.. (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by Sonoma Clean Power Authority, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Gorton, Mark) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 52 Discovery Letter Brief to the Honorable James Donato filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Julian, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13694994.) filed by The Baupost Group, L.L.C.. (Palmieri, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13694686.) filed by The Baupost Group, L.L.C.. (Seiler, Eric) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alaina Heine. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shmuel Vasser. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Allan S. Brilliant. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by PAUL J. PASCUZZI, California State Agencies, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Pascuzzi, Paul) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Orsini, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/2019 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/10/19, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #21 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (Related documents(s) #21 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 10, 2019 before Judge James Donato by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Morris, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DKT. NO. #62 ***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference set for 10/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato.Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Alisa C Lacey (Lacey, Alisa) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/10/2019 before Judge James Donato by Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Diemer (Diemer, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Eve Weissman for Allan S. Brilliant, Shmuel Vasser and Alaina Heine (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Alaina Heine ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13685956.) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Shmuel Vasser ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13685949.) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Allan S. Brilliant ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13685919.) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weissman, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Riddle (Riddle, Amanda) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gerard Davis for Antonio Yanez, Jr. (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gerard Davis for Benjamin P. McCallen (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gerard Davis (Davis, Joseph) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Abid Quereshi. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ira S. Dizengoff. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael S. Stamer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David H.Botter. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/19 before Judge James Donato by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Silveira, Dara) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of Class Claimants re Initial Status Conference by Kevin Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser Notice of Appearance of Brandt Silver-Korn (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser Notice of Appearance of Todd Logan (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser Notice of Appearance of Rafey S. Balabanian (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Joseph Ballan (Ballan, Evan) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Budner (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Regarding September 10, 2019 Status Conference on Estimation filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jason Wells in Support of First Day Motions, #2 Exhibit B - Debtors Motion for Establishment of Wildfire Claim Estimation Procedures, #3 Exhibit C - Memorandum Decision Regarding Motions for Relief from Stay, #4 Exhibit D - Recommendation for Withdrawal of Reference of Proceeding in Part, #5 Exhibit E - Transcript of August 27 Hearing, #6 Exhibit F - Transcript of August 14 Hearing, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Appeal of Orders Granting Relief from Stay, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Paul Zumbro in Support of Motion to Retain Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, #9 Exhibit I - Summary Sheet to First Interim Fee Application of Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, #10 Exhibit J - Request for Entry of Order by Default on Discounted EP Assumption Motion, #11 Exhibit K - Response of California State Agencies to Estimation Motion, #12 Exhibit L - Response of United States to Estimation Motion)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT SLF Fire Victim Claimants' Unilateral Status Report by SLF Fire Victim Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John F. McGuire in Support of SLF Claimants' Unilateral Status Conference Statement, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Marshack, Richard) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander James Demtro Lewicki on behalf of the Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Abid Qureshi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13678321.) filed by Ashley Vinson Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ira S. Dizengoff ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13678280.) filed by Ashley Vinson Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Stamer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13678247.) filed by Ashley Vinson Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David H. Botter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26K0C93P.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/5/2019 filed by Ashley Vinson Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Brooke Vinson Crawford Attorney for the Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Crawford, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra I. Grassgreen Notice of Appearance of Pachulski Stang Zeihl & Jones LLP and Freidman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP (Grassgreen, Debra) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Onofrei Scarpulla and Patrick B. Clayton (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. A status conference is set for September 10, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss the legal and factual issues for resolution, a proposed case schedule, coordination with related proceedings in the bankruptcy and state courts, and settlement procedures. A joint status conference statement should be filed by September 5, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE OF PROCEEDING IN PART; ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT re #1 ORDER Re: Recommendation for Withdrawal of Reference of Proceeding in Part. Adopting recommendation of the Bankruptcy Judge. Signed by Executive Committee on August 22, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Re: Recommendation for Withdrawal of Reference of Proceeding in Part. Signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Dennis Montali on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Documents, #2 Docket Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re PG&E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jason Blumberg
Represented By: Lynette Carol Kelly
Represented By: Timothy S. Laffredi
Represented By: Cameron Gulden
Represented By: Marta Elena Villacorta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Samuel A. Khalil
Represented By: Paul S. Aronzon
Represented By: Andrew Michael Leblanc
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Thomas R. Kreller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Creditor Committee Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Lauren T. Attard
Represented By: Kody D.L. Kleber
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Lars H. Fuller
Represented By: Elyssa S. Kates
Represented By: Joseph M. Esmont
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: Catherine E. Woltering
Represented By: Eric Evan Sagerman
Represented By: Cecily A. Dumas
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Dustin M. Dow
Represented By: Kimberly S. Morris
Represented By: Gregory J. Commins, Jr.
Represented By: Terry Michael Brennan
Represented By: David William Rice
Represented By: Danyll W Foix
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow,
Represented By: Kyle Thomas Cutts
Represented By: Thomas E Hogan
Represented By: David John Richardson
Represented By: Bridget Springer McCabe
Represented By: Daniel Michael Kavouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GER Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Bradford Clayton
Represented By: Francis Onofrei Scarpulla
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ashley Vinson Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevin Burnett
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Kevin R. Budner
Represented By: Todd M. Logan
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Evan Joseph Ballan
Represented By: Brandt Silver-Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Individual Fire Victim Creditors
Represented By: Joseph Kyle Feist
Represented By: Thomas Tosdal
Represented By: Amanda L. Riddle
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Represented By: Alison Elizabeth Cordova
Represented By: Paige Nicole Boldt
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ad Hoc Committee of Senior Unsecured Noteholders of Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Ira S. Dizengoff
Represented By: David H. Botter
Represented By: Michael Stamer
Represented By: Abid Qureshi
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Vinson Crawford
Represented By: John C. Murphy
Represented By: Jack C. Murphy
Represented By: Michael Scott Stamer,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alaina Heine
Represented By: Shmuel Vasser,
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Allan S Brilliant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SLF Fire Victim Claimants
Represented By: Laila Masud
Represented By: Richard Alan Marshack
Represented By: Robert Thomas Bryson
Represented By: Gerald Blaine Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard W. Carpeneti
Represented By: Patrick Bradford Clayton
Represented By: Francis Onofrei Scarpulla
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sonoma Clean Power Authority
Represented By: Mark Adelos Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark Bowman, et al.
Represented By: James Patrick Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Adventist Health System/West
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Feather River Hospital
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paradise Unified School District
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Napa Recycling and Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sara Shepherd
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael Heinstein
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sonoma Courts Shops, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: William O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Karen Roberds
Represented By: Karen Joyce Chedister
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rita Godward
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Allen Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anita Freeman
Represented By: Karen Joyce Chedister
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Butte County Mosquito and Vector Control District
Represented By: Manuel Anthony Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Melissa Redmond
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stan Rickaby
Represented By: Larry Allan Peluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kye Heinstein
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Fuguan O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clinton Reilly
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jon Shepherd
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Northern Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: William Ferrence
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kenneth Born
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Patricia Goodberg
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Terrence Redmond
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin Mintz
Represented By: Thomas Francis Koegel
Represented By: Gerardo Mijares-Shafai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paradise Irrigation District
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: William Steel
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Napa County Recycling and Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: David Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Christine Born
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cathy Ferrence
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paul Goodberg
Represented By: Thomas Walter Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Simon Mason
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Quentin L. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ming O'Brien
Represented By: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Adventist Health System/West, and Feather River Hospital d/b/a Adventist Health Feather River
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Thomas B. Rupp
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Max Africk
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Represented By: Darin P. McAtee
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Represented By: Michael Jacob Zaken
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Thomas B. Rupp
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Max Africk
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Represented By: Darin P. McAtee
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Represented By: Joe Wesley Earnhardt
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Represented By: Michael Jacob Zaken
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ad Hoc Group of Subrogation Claim Holders
Represented By: Alexander James Demtro Lewicki
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Freimuth
Represented By: Kathryn S. Diemer
Represented By: Joseph Gerard Davis
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Represented By: Victoria Anne Sheets
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick McCallen
Represented By: Alexander J. Lewicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Public Advocates Office at the California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Alisa C Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Baupost Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jason C. Rubinstein
Represented By: Debra I. Grassgreen
Represented By: Philippe Adler
Represented By: Michael Stephen Palmieri
Represented By: Jason C Rubinstein
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: California State Agencies
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PG&E Holdco Group (Interested Party)
Represented By: Michael Magayne Lauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PAUL J. PASCUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PG&E Shareholders
Represented By: Morgan Reid Hirst
Represented By: James Olin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Danielle Ann Pham
Represented By: Michael Scott Tye
Represented By: Matthew Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: People of the State of California
Represented By: Nicholas Mead Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Grant
Represented By: Brendan Matthew Kunkle
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Karen Gowins
Represented By: Steven Sheldon Kane
Represented By: Bonnie Ellen Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William B. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?