Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. v. Creative Energy Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Defendant: Creative Energy Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05285
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brittany Frandsen. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13747877) filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Frandsen, Brittany) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James W. McConkie III. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13677198.) filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Frandsen, Brittany) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. Service waived by Creative Energy Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Case, Aaron) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc... (Case, Aaron) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13675124.) filed by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. (McConkie, James) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/29/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT; (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint Trademark, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Creative Energy Foods, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED:PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #8 Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/26/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HF Holdings, Inc. for Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Case, Aaron) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Case, Aaron) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Creative Energy Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13643867.). Filed byIcon Health & Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Case, Aaron) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. v. Creative Energy Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Steven Case
Represented By: Stephen Henry Smith
Represented By: Brittany Frandsen
Represented By: James W McConkie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Energy Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?