DG3 North America, Inc. v. Lob.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation and DG3 North America, Inc.
Defendant: Lob.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05290
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byLob.com, Inc.. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 6, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2020 09:00 AM., at the Goodwin Procter offices at Three Embarcadero Center, San Francisco. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Jenny Yelin as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by DG3 North America, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Wilde, Jessica) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting (16) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting (23) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:19-cv-05287-SK; granting (15) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:19-cv-05290-SK. Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Fact Discovery is 10/30/2020. Opening Expert Reports due by 11/13/2020. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 12/11/2020. Close of Expert Discovery is 1/1/2021. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Jury Selection set for 6/15/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Case Management and Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on November 25, 2019. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2019 re (23 in 3:19-cv-05287-SK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by DG3 Group (Holdings) Ltd., (16 in 3:19-cv-05287-SK) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lob.com, Inc., (15 in 3:19-cv-05290-SK) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim filed by Lob.com, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/25/2019. The motions are taken under submission. A written order will issue. Trial date and schedule set. The Court will issue a case management order. Case referred to mediation to be completed by 3/26/2020. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor.(FTR Time: 9:37-9:59.) Attorney for Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant: Jessica Wilde. Attorneys for Defendant/Cross-Claimant: Neel Chatterjee; Luc Dahlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/25/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by DG3 North America, Inc.. (Wilde, Jessica) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by DG3 North America, Inc.. (Wilde, Jessica) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wilde, Jessica) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES. Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/25/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Motion Hearing as to as to (23 in 3:19-cv-05287-SK) MOTION to Dismiss , (16 in 3:19-cv-05287-SK) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , (15 in 3:19-cv-05290-SK) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim reset for 11/25/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 10/16/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim) filed by Lob.com, Inc.. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim ) filed by DG3 North America, Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that this case is related to 19-cv-05287-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/24/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lob.com, Inc... (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/30/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lob.com, Inc. of re #15 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim, re #16 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Lob.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Lob.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Lob.com, Inc.. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Ray Mello, Jr (Mello, Daniel) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas H. Dahlin (Dahlin, Lucas) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim; granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Christopher Santomassimo. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim; granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jessica Wilde. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice - Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Christopher Santomassimo, (Filing Fee: $310,00, receipt number 0971-13690662) filed by DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice - Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Jessica M. Wilde, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13690635) filed by DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lob.com, Inc.(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/26/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation Fail ure to Add Defendant Party to the Court Docket (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract; Unjust Enrichment; and Book Account and Account Stated against DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13644478.). Filed byDG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wong, Eric) (Filed on 8/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DG3 North America, Inc. v. Lob.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG3 North America, Inc. A New Jersey Corporation
Represented By: Eric Sean Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DG3 North America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Santomassimo
Represented By: Jessica M. Wilde,
Represented By: Eric Sean Wong
Represented By: Jessica M. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lob.com, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Lucas H. Dahlin
Represented By: Daniel Ray Mello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?