Cohen et al v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Benjamin, Jonathan Wolfe, Scott Cischke, Nicholas Carlson, Chad Smith, Andrew Cohen, Kaleah C Allen, Sarah D Smith, Mark Weiler, Timothy Hornick, Albert Collins and Matt Koppin
Defendant: Apple Inc. and Samsung Electronic America Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05322
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Amisha R. Patel.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Amisha R. Patel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13769971.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patel, Amisha) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christina Guerola Sarchio. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Cheffo. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mark Cheffo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13754108.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cheffo, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christina Guerola Sarchio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13753950.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifcate of Good Standing)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert J. Katerberg. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elisabeth S. Theodore. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Katerberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13733037.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/24/2019 filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Katerberg, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth S. Theodore ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13732858.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/24/2019 filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Theodore, Elisabeth) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert J. Katerberg. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elisabeth S. Theodore. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 Case REASSIGNED to Judge William Alsup. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Katerberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13733037.) filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Katerberg, Robert) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth S. Theodore ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13732858.) filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Theodore, Elisabeth) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronic America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronic America Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apple, Inc for Apple Inc.. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam OF COUNSEL (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Fegan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13724033.) filed by Kaleah C Allen, Kimberly Benjamin, Nicholas Carlson, Scott Cischke, Andrew Cohen, Albert Collins, Timothy Hornick, Matt Koppin, Chad Smith, Sarah D Smith, Mark Weiler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fegan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, - EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaleah C Allen, Kimberly Benjamin, Nicholas Carlson, Scott Cischke, Andrew Cohen, Albert Collins, Timothy Hornick, Matt Koppin, Chad Smith, Sarah D Smith, Mark Weiler re #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaleah C Allen, Kimberly Benjamin, Nicholas Carlson, Scott Cischke, Andrew Cohen, Albert Collins, Timothy Hornick, Matt Koppin, Chad Smith, Sarah D Smith, Mark Weiler.. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., Samsung Electronic America Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Proposed Summons should be filed using the correct event and as a separate document. Proposed Summons should not be file d as an attachment or exhibit to a document* This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-2]as to SUMMONS ONLY, filed by Mark Weiler, Sarah Smith, Andrew Cohen, Jonathan Wolfe, Kaleah C Allen, Nicholas Carlson, Scott Cischke, Timothy Hornick, Kimberly Benjamin, Chad Smith (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13645104.). Filed byJonathan Wolfe, Kimberly Benjamin, Mark Weiler, Sarah D Smith, Kaleah C Allen, Chad Smith, Andrew Cohen, Timothy Hornick, Scott Cischke, Nicholas Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 8/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Benjamin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wolfe
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Cischke
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Carlson
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Smith
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cohen
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleah C Allen
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah D Smith
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Weiler
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hornick
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Collins
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Koppin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christina Guerola Sarchio
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Represented By: Amisha Rajni Patel
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronic America Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth Susan Theodore
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Winthrop
Represented By: Robert J. Katerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?